EP3758821 - SCALED VR ENGAGEMENT AND VIEWS IN AN E-SPORTS EVENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROMBETTA, Steven 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
THIELBAR, Christopher 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
FAIRBAIRN, James 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19761523.0 | 05.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019US16694 | Priority number, date | US201815908704 | 28.02.2018 Original published format: US201815908704 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168637 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758821 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/86, A63F13/30, A63F13/335, A63F13/35, A63F13/352, A63F13/355, A63F13/87, A63F13/5258, A63F13/61 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0241 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/525 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/26 (US);
A63F13/5258 (EP);
A63F13/61 (EP,US);
A63F13/79 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | A63F13/86, A63F13/30, A63F13/335, A63F13/35, A63F13/352, A63F13/355 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | SKALIERTE VR-EINBINDUNG UND ANSICHTEN BEI EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN SPORTVERANSTALTUNG | [2021/01] | English: | SCALED VR ENGAGEMENT AND VIEWS IN AN E-SPORTS EVENT | [2021/01] | French: | ENGAGEMENT DE VR MIS À L'ÉCHELLE ET VUES DANS UN ÉVÉNEMENT SPORTIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007117635 (SPANTON BRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2011250939 (HOBLER MARC L [US]); | [Y]US2017006074 (OATES III ROBERT HARVEY [US]); | [A]US2017003740 (VERFAILLIE DAVID HENDRIK [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2014171039 (BJONTEGARD BERNT ERIK [US]); | [Y]US2015248792 (ABOVITZ RONY [US], et al); | [XY]US2017001111 (WILLETTE MICHAEL ANTHONY [US], et al); | [A]US2017157512 (LONG JIEYI [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007117635 | US2017006074 |