EP3759722 - METHOD, COMPUTING DEVICE AND WEARABLE DEVICE FOR SLEEP STAGE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIRAVANICHKUL, Maneerat c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 02 /
JIRAJARAS, Thada c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 03 /
THAVEEPRUNGSRIPORN, Visit c/o Nitto Denko Asia Technical Centre Pte Ltd 3 Biopolis Drive, Synapse, Unit 03-17/18 Singapore 138623 / SG | 04 /
SRISUKH, Pannawit c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | 05 /
THIAMTAWAN, Pongsarun c/o Zensorium (Thailand) Ltd No. 2525, FYI Center 5th Floor, Unit 1/507-508 Rama 4 Road, Klongtoei Klongtoei, Bangkok, 10110 / TH | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Bradley, Susan Jane Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19761655.0 | 28.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019SG50111 | Priority number, date | SG20181001850P | 02.03.2018 Original published format: SG10201801850P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019168474 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759722 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 06.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, G06N3/08, A61B5/00, A61B5/024, G06F17/18, G06N20/00, G06N3/04, G16H20/10 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/4812 (EP,KR,US);
G16H50/70 (KR);
A61B5/02405 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/4815 (KR);
A61B5/4839 (EP);
A61B5/4848 (US);
A61B5/7221 (US);
A61B5/7267 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR);
G06N3/084 (EP,KR);
G16H20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G16H20/70 (EP,KR);
G16H40/67 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP,KR,US);
G16H50/30 (US);
G16H50/50 (KR);
A61B5/024 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, RECHNERVORRICHTUNG UND AM KÖRPER TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON SCHLAFSTADIEN | [2021/01] | English: | METHOD, COMPUTING DEVICE AND WEARABLE DEVICE FOR SLEEP STAGE DETECTION | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE ET DISPOSITIF VESTIMENTAIRE POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN STADE DU SOMMEIL | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SG | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009198145 (CHOW HARRISON [US]) [A] 15* paragraph [0118] *; | [XI]US2017274174 (PURDON PATRICK L [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * figures 6, 10 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0065] * [I] 14,15; | [XI] - SIDDHARTH BISWAL ET AL, "SLEEPNET: Automated Sleep Staging System via Deep Learning", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170726), XP080779539 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph l - page 10, paragraph l * * table 4 * [I] 2-4 | [I] - TAKEDA TOKI ET AL, "Time-dependent sleep stage transition model based on heart rate variability", 2015 37TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY (EMBC), IEEE, (20150825), doi:10.1109/EMBC.2015.7318863, pages 2343 - 2346, XP032810689 [I] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 4 * * page 2345, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EMBC.2015.7318863 | [I] - XU GAO ET AL, "Modeling Binary Time Series Using Gaussian Processes with Application to Predicting Sleep States", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20171115), XP080837343 [I] 1-4 * abstract * * tables 1-12 * | [A] - WERTENI HAYET ET AL, "Sleep-wake stages classification based on heart rate variability", BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING AND INFORMATICS (BMEI), 2012 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121016), doi:10.1109/BMEI.2012.6513040, ISBN 978-1-4673-1183-0, pages 996 - 999, XP032395453 [A] 8-11 * figure 1 * * table 1 * * page 997, column l, paragraph 3 - page 998, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/BMEI.2012.6513040 | [A] - LU WEI ET AL, "Feature fusion for imbalanced ECG data analysis", BIOMEDICAL SIGNAL PROCESSING AND CONTROL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20171220), vol. 41, doi:10.1016/J.BSPC.2017.11.010, ISSN 1746-8094, pages 152 - 160, XP085499145 [A] 8-11 * abstract * * figures 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bspc.2017.11.010 | [AP] - JOHN MALIK ET AL, "Sleep-wake classification via quantifying heart rate variability by convolutional neural network", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180801), doi:10.1088/1361-6579/AAD5A9, XP080903875 [AP] 8-11 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1361-6579/aad5a9 | International search | [A]US2011218454 (LOW PHILIP [US]) [A] 3, 12-16, 29-35 * whole document especially paragraphs [0077], [0127]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2015147418 (URADE YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 26-35 * paragraphs [0029]-[0031], [0077], [0081], [0090], table 10 *; | [A]AU2015268701 (NEUROVIGIL INC [US]) [A] 28* whole document especially paragraph [00158] *; | [X]CN105982643 (IND TECH RES INST) [X] 1-3, 7-16, 29-35 * paragraphs [0052], [0057]-[0062], [0076]-[0078], [0081]; figures 1-5, 10 of the original non-English language document (a machine translation is enclosed only for your reference) *; | [A]US2017055898 (BANDYOPADHYAY AMRIT [US], et al) [A] 17-25 * whole document especially paragraphs [0098], [0100], [0103], [0104], [0123]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2017273617 (KAJI HIROTAKA [JP]) [A] 3, 12-16, 29-35 * whole document especially paragraphs [0020], [0075] *; | [A]US2017360308 (FONSECA PEDRO MIGUEL [BE], et al) [A] 3, 12-16, 29-35 * whole document especially paragraph [0025] * | by applicant | US9655559 | US2017274174 | - TAKEDA TOKI et al., "37th Annual International Conference of the IEEE Engineering", Medicine and Biology Society, (20150825), pages 2343 - 2346 |