EP3830576 - POLYMER-BASED BIOSPECIMEN COLLECTION DEVICES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaxess Technologies, Inc. c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUGE, Jonathan A. c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
BELIVEAU, Alexander c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
LI, Adrian Benton c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
DIRCKX, Matthew c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
SCHRADER, Michael A. c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 06 /
KOSUDA, Kathryn M. c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 07 /
JOHANSEN, Elizabeth Whitney c/o 790 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19761984.4 | 26.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US43727 | Priority number, date | US201862711269P | 27.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862711269 P | US201962845537P | 09.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962845537 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020023906 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3830576 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/543 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/5302 (EP);
B01L3/5023 (US);
G01N1/38 (US);
G01N33/5306 (EP);
G01N33/54366 (EP);
G01N33/54393 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | BIOPROBENAHMEVORRICHTUNGEN AUF POLYMERBASIS UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/23] | English: | POLYMER-BASED BIOSPECIMEN COLLECTION DEVICES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/23] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE PRÉLÈVEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES À BASE DE POLYMÈRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/40] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 03.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2022 | Decision despatched | 03.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5891734 (GILL JAMES E [US], et al)[A] 1-25,55-86,101-103; | [A]US2005124965 (HAYWOOD BRUCE C [US]) [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103; | [I]US2016263228 (KLUGE JONATHAN A [US], et al) [I] 1-25,55-86,101-103 * examples, par.420, claims *; | [A]US2017082585 (DEWITTE ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103; | [A]CN107356778 (YANTAI DEMAI BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103; | [A] - LI ADRIAN B ET AL, "Silk-based stabilization of biomacromolecules", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150925), vol. 219, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2015.09.037, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 416 - 430, XP029303669 [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2015.09.037 | [A] - ELEANOR M. PRITCHARD ET AL, "Physical and chemical aspects of stabilization of compounds in silk", BIOPOLYMERS, (20120623), vol. 97, no. 6, doi:10.1002/bip.22026, ISSN 0006-3525, pages 479 - 498, XP055150986 [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bip.22026 | [A] - JONATHAN A. KLUGE ET AL, "Silk-based blood stabilization for diagnostics", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES (PNAS), US, (20160509), vol. 113, no. 21, doi:10.1073/pnas.1602493113, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5892 - 5897, XP055629961 [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1602493113 | [A] - JIUYANG HE ET AL, "Stabilization of RNA Encapsulated in Silk", ACS BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE & ENGINEERING, US, (20180326), doi:10.1021/acsbiomaterials.8b00207, ISSN 2373-9878, XP055630829 [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsbiomaterials.8b00207 | [A] - JONATHAN A. KLUGE ET AL, "Optimizing Molecular Weight of Lyophilized Silk As a Shelf-Stable Source Material", ACS BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE & ENGINEERING, US, (20160317), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1021/acsbiomaterials.5b00556, ISSN 2373-9878, pages 595 - 605, XP055630799 [A] 1-25,55-86,101-103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsbiomaterials.5b00556 | by applicant | US5245012 | WO9708315 | WO2014145002 |