02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
20.06.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
12.01.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
05.12.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
04.08.2023 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
14.07.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
07.07.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.02.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
19.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
29.10.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
16.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.04.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
25.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
27.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
10.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|