EP3843969 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING INJECTION MOULDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEKUMA GmbH Dornierstrasse 14 85399 Hallbergmoos / DE | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMMERLOHER, Jakob Haidhofstraße 4 85395 Wolfersdorf / DE | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Rings, Rolf Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19762341.6 | 27.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019EP72882 | Priority number, date | DE201810120963 | 28.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018120963 | [2021/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043738 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843969 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3843969 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/17, B65B35/20, B65B23/22, // B29L31/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B29C45/1769 (EP,RU,US);
B65B5/10 (RU,US);
B65B23/22 (EP,RU);
B65B35/10 (RU,US);
B65B35/20 (EP,RU);
B65B35/30 (RU);
B29L2031/753 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | B29C45/17, B65B35/30, B29L31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERPACKEN VON SPRITZGUSSTEILEN | [2021/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING INJECTION MOULDINGS | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EMBALLAGE DE PIÈCES MOULÉES PAR INJECTION | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 07.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | CZ | 28.09.2022 | |
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 28.09.2022 | |
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | HR | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 28.09.2022 | |
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 28.09.2022 | |
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011003507 (WALDORF TECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * figures 2a-2e * * abstract *; | [A]US2014165511 (EBERLE GUIDO [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0053] , [0 54] , [0 56] * * figures 2, 3 *; | [AD]WO2015049350 (HEKUMA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,6 * figures 1-15 * * abstract *; | [A]DE102015109734 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [AP]EP3424670 (GD SPA [IT]) [AP] 1,6 * figures 9-14 ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | [AP]DE102017118527 (WALDORF TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1,6 | by applicant | EP3052388 |