EP3844384 - ROTOR BLADE, WIND TURBINE, AND METHOD FOR OPTIMISING A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstraße 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSING, Ralf Hilgenbusch 5 26605 Aurich / DE | 02 /
ZIEMS, Jan Carsten Horumer Straße 84a 26607 Aurich / DE | 03 /
RUBNER, Florian Virchowstraße 3 26607 Aurich / DE | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19762737.5 | 27.08.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019EP72837 | Priority number, date | DE201810121190 | 30.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018121190 | [2021/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020043722 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844384 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP);
F03D1/0633 (US);
F05B2240/2211 (US);
F05B2240/302 (EP,US);
F05B2240/3062 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | ROTORBLATT, WINDENERGIEANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM OPTIMIEREN EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2021/27] | English: | ROTOR BLADE, WIND TURBINE, AND METHOD FOR OPTIMISING A WIND TURBINE | [2021/27] | French: | PALE DE ROTOR, ÉOLIENNE ET PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]EP2634418 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [XDI]EP2799710 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [XI]US2016047357 (ERBSLÖH SASCHA [DE], et al); | by applicant | EP1944505 | DE102012107415 | EP2634418 | EP2657513 | EP2799710 | US2018038343 |