EP3837376 - RHODOCOCCUS RHODOCHROUS STRAIN AND USE THEREOF IN THE PRODUCTION OF ACRYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AECI Limited AECI Place The Woodlands Woodlands Drive Woodmead 2196 Sandton / ZA | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANNERMAN, Natasha c/o AECI Place The Woodlands Woodlands Drive Woodmead 2196 Sandton / ZA | 02 /
DLALISA, Nolusizo Khaliphile c/o AECI Place The Woodlands Woodlands Drive Woodmead 2196 Sandton / ZA | 03 /
ETTY, Lee Anne c/o AECI Place The Woodlands Woodlands Drive Woodmead 2196 Sandton / ZA | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19762901.7 | 16.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019ZA50047 | Priority number, date | ZA20180005469 | 16.08.2018 Original published format: ZA 201805469 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020037338 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837376 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/02, C12N1/36, C12N9/78, C12N9/88, C12N15/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C12Y402/01084 (EP);
C12N9/78 (EP,US);
C12N1/36 (EP);
C12N9/88 (EP);
C12P13/02 (EP);
C12P7/40 (US);
C12Y305/05001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | RHODOCOCCUS RHODOCHROUS STAMM UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON ACRYLSÄURE | [2022/16] | English: | RHODOCOCCUS RHODOCHROUS STRAIN AND USE THEREOF IN THE PRODUCTION OF ACRYLIC ACID | [2021/25] | French: | SOUCHE DE RHODOCOCCUS RHODOCHROUS ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE ACRYLIQUE | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/25] | RHODOCOCCUS-RHODOCHROUS-STAMM UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ACRYLSÄURE | ||
Former [2021/25] | SOUCHE DE RHODOCOCCUS RHODOCHREUX ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE ACRYLIQUE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 18.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9721805 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 8 * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 3, line 28 - page 10, line 8; examples 1-15 * * claims 1, 12-14 * [Y] 1-7,9-18; | [Y]CN105420154 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [Y] 1-7,9-18 * the whole document *; | [XY] - SANKHIAN U D ET AL, "Nitrile hydratase of Rhodococcus rhodochrous NHB-2: Optimisation of conditions for production of enzyme and conversion of acrylonitrile to acrylamide", ASIAN JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, BIOTECHNOLOGY & ENVIRONMENTALSCIENCES, GLOBAL SCIENCE PUBLICATIONS, ALIGARTH, IN, (20030101), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 0972-3005, pages 217 - 223, XP009086468 [X] 3,5 * abstract * * page 219, column r, paragraph 2 - page 220, column l, line 2; tables 1,2 * [Y] 4,10,12 | [X] - KOBAYASHI M ET AL, "PURIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL NITRILASE OF RHODOCOCCUS RHODOCHROUS K22 THAT ACTS ON ALIPHATIC NITRILES", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY,, (19900901), vol. 172, no. 9, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4807 - 4815, XP001052643 [X] 8 * abstract * * page 4812, column r, paragraph 2 - page 4813, column r, paragraph 1; table 3 * | [Y] - NAGASAWA T ET AL, "EPSILON-CAPROLACTAM, A NEW POWERFUL INDUCER FOR THE FORMATION OF RHODOCOCCUS RHODOCHROUS J1 NITRILASE", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, (19901201), vol. 155, no. 1, doi:10.1007/BF00291267, ISSN 0302-8933, pages 13 - 17, XP002028289 [Y] 6,7,10,11 * abstract * * page 13, column r, paragraph 3 - page 16, column l, paragraph 32; tables 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00291267 | by applicant | - "NCIMB", Database accession no. 42803 |