EP3761978 - INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN ARGININE METHYLTRANSFERASE 5 (PRMT5), PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS THEREOF, AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHARMABLOCK SCIENCES (NANJING), INC. 10 Xuefu Road Jiangbei New Area Nanjing, Jiangsu 210032 / CN | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Liu 2814 Rathmore Ln Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 02 /
LI, Jin 4-1003, XuriShangCheng III 6 Liuzhou East Road Pukou District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Minmin Apt 12-705 9 East Lake Mochou Road Nanjing, Jiangsu 210029 / CN | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19763499.1 | 08.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US21497 | Priority number, date | US201862641241P | 09.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862641241 P | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173804 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761978 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/428, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444, A61P35/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C07D217/24 (EP,KR);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4725 (KR);
A61K31/517 (KR);
A61K31/553 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P3/04 (KR);
A61P3/10 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/04 (US);
A61P37/00 (KR);
A61P7/06 (KR);
C07D401/06 (US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/06 (EP);
C07D451/02 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | A61K31/428, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DER PROTEIN-ARGININ-METHYLTRANSFERASE 5 (PRMT5), PHARMAZEUTISCHE PRODUKTE DAVON UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/02] | English: | INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN ARGININE METHYLTRANSFERASE 5 (PRMT5), PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS THEREOF, AND METHODS THEREOF | [2021/02] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PROTÉINE ARGININE MÉTHYLTRANSFÉRASE 5 (PRMT5), LEURS PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 22.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014100719 (EPIZYME INC [US]); | International search | [A]WO2014100716 (EPIZYME INC [US]); | [A]US9611257 (DUNCAN KENNETH W [US], et al); | [A]US9777008 (DUNCAN KENNETH W [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2013120980 | WO2014100719 | WO2014100716 |