EP3762256 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING ASSEMBLY OF A VEHICLE FROM A SET OF MODULES, A CONTROL DEVICE, A SYSTEM, A VEHICLE, A COMPUTER PROGRAM AND A COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2021/17] |
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAESSON, André Sågstuguvägen 19 146 38 Tullinge / SE | 02 /
SJÖDIN, Robert Skogvaktarvägen 11 611 44 Nyköping / SE | 03 /
ÄHRLIG, Linus Stenvägen 22 137 37 Västerhaninge / SE | 04 /
BEDELL, Michael Gallstrandsvägen 21B 585 99 Linköping / SE | 05 /
LOCK ANDERSSON, Erik Norrbackagatan 16 113 41 Stockholm / SE | 06 /
HENRIKSSON, Henrik Birkagatan 33 113 39 Stockholm / SE | 07 /
TEPPOLA, Sami Fruktvägen 50 155 31 Nykvarn / SE | 08 /
KALLIO, Mikko Nyhemsvägen 11 153 71 Hölö / SE | 09 /
SKEPPSTRÖM, Tomas Bränningestrandsvägen 44 151 39 Södertälje / SE | 10 /
COLLING, Morgan Nilsbo Lämbonäsvägen 54 153 94 Hölö / SE | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19763661.6 | 26.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019SE50168 | Priority number, date | SE20180050239 | 06.03.2018 Original published format: SE 1850239 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172820 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762256 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3762256 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/42, B62D63/02 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
B60P3/42 (EP,KR,SE);
B62D63/025 (EP,KR,SE,US);
B60P1/64 (KR);
B62D27/06 (KR);
B62D63/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER MONTAGE EINES FAHRZEUGS AUS EINER GRUPPE VON MODULEN, STEUERVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM, FAHRZEUG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2021/02] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING ASSEMBLY OF A VEHICLE FROM A SET OF MODULES, A CONTROL DEVICE, A SYSTEM, A VEHICLE, A COMPUTER PROGRAM AND A COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER L'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN VÉHICULE À PARTIR D'UN ENSEMBLE DE MODULES, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, SYSTÈME, VÉHICULE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 09.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | MC | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
IT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017197678 (SCARINGE ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE102016209099 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-24 * figures 1-3 ** paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041] * | International search | [A]US9352745 (THEOBALD DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-23 * ; abstract; figures *; | [A]WO2017097422 (HANSEN ERNST-HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1-23* ; abstract; figures *; | [Y]US2017197679 (SCARINGE ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0019], [0023]; figures *; | [A]DE102016009685 (PERDOLT GOTTFRIED [AT]) [A] 1-23 * ; abstract; figures *; | [Y]DE102016209099 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-23 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0035], [0044]-[0047]; figures * |