EP3701850 - APPLICATOR DEVICE FOR ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goryo Chemical, Inc. Earee Bldg. 5F 35-100 Kita 8-Jo Nishi 18-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0008 / JP | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Takashi 4-29-3, Myojin-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0046 / JP | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19763774.7 | 04.03.2019 | [2020/36] | WO2019JP08428 | Priority number, date | JP20180038766 | 05.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018038766 | [2020/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172189 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701850 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/045, A61B1/06, A61B1/12, A61B1/018, A61B1/04, A61N5/06 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A61B1/00089 (EP,US);
A61B1/00009 (US);
A61B1/00045 (US);
A61B1/00101 (EP);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B1/043 (EP,US);
A61B1/0607 (EP);
A61B1/0646 (EP,US);
A61B1/0676 (EP);
A61B1/0684 (EP,US);
A61N5/0603 (EP,US);
A61N5/062 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | A61B1/00, A61B1/045, A61B1/06, A61B1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | APPLIKATOR FÜR ENDOSKOP | [2020/36] | English: | APPLICATOR DEVICE FOR ENDOSCOPE | [2020/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF APPLICATEUR POUR ENDOSCOPE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2020 | Translation filed | 29.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 23.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/31] | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007020759 (PENTAX CORP) [Y] 6,7* paragraph [0038] *; | [XY]US2007106119 (HIRATA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9-14 * paragraph [0079] * * figures 3A, 3B, 7A * [Y] 6,7; | [X]US2008021274 (BAYER LEX [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0085] , [0086] * * figure 6 *; | [XY]US2010188493 (KANZAKI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-14 * paragraph [0059] * * figures 2,5,29,31 * [Y] 6,7 | International search | [YA]JP2003190091 (PENTAX CORP) [Y] 1-7, 9-10, 12- 14 * , paragraphs [0004]-[0015], [0027]-[0034], fig. 1-6 & US 2003/0120129 A1, paragraphs [0006]-[0013], [0031]-[0038], fig. 1-5 * [A] 8, 11; | [Y]JP2003220021 (PENTAX CORP) [Y] 3-7 * , paragraphs [0004]-[0008], [0015], [0019], fig. 1-10 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011104333 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 7* , abstract, paragraphs [0030]-[0033] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2012081048 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 1-7, 9-10, 12- 14 * , paragraphs [0008]-[0011], [0019], [0026]-[0029], [0032]-[0033], [0039], [0043]-[0044], [0046]-[0047], [0059], [0077]-[0078], [0083], fig. 1-4, 9, 12-13 & CN 102551639 A * [A] 8, 11 | by applicant | JP2012050511 | JP2012081048 |