Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11293903 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2020408718 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180026445 | 06.03.2018 | WO2019KR02614 | 06.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6834107B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2021 | B2 | JP2020525773 | 27.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180026445 | 06.03.2018 | WO2019KR02614 | 06.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110869758B | Global Dossier | 19.07.2022 | B | CN110869758 | 06.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180026445 | 06.03.2018 | WO2019KR02614 | 06.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3677908 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2023 | B1 | EP3677908 | 06.01.2021 | A4 | EP3677908 | 08.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180026445 | 06.03.2018 | WO2019KR02614 | 06.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019172655 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180026445 | 06.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102259968B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | B1 | KR20190106773 | 18.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180026445 | 06.03.2018 |