EP3750211 - ANTENNA SYSTEM WITH ACTIVE ARRAY ON TRACKING PEDESTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sea Tel, Inc. (DBA Cobham Satcom) 4030 Nelson Avenue Concord, CA 94520 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADADA, Rami c/o Sea Tel, Inc. (dba Cobham Satcom) 4030 Nelson Avenue Concord, CA 94520 / US | 02 /
GUAN, Wei-Jung c/o Sea Tel, Inc. (dba Cobham Satcom) 4030 Nelson Avenue Concord, CA 94520 / US | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton, York YO26 6QY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19764072.5 | 31.01.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019US16130 | Priority number, date | US201862639926P | 07.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862639926 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173014 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750211 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/08, H01Q1/34, H01Q25/00, H01Q1/12 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H01Q1/125 (EP,KR);
H01Q1/34 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,KR);
H01Q3/04 (KR,US);
H01Q3/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q3/2652 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | H01Q3/08, H01Q3/02, H01Q21/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | ANTENNENSYSTEM MIT AKTIVEM FELD AUF EINEM VERFOLGUNGSSOCKEL | [2020/51] | English: | ANTENNA SYSTEM WITH ACTIVE ARRAY ON TRACKING PEDESTAL | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANTENNE À MATRICE ACTIVE SUR SOCLE DE POURSUITE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 05.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5419521 (MATTHEWS ROBERT J [US]); | [XA]EP1025618 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [XA]US6151496 (RICHARDS RANDY J [US], et al); | [XI]WO0231915 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]EP2789050 (SPACECOM HOLDING APS [DK]) | International search | [A]US2003128159 (DE LA CHAPELLE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2008258988 (SON SEONG-HO [KR], et al); | [A]US2015349417 (RICHARDS MATTHEW [US], et al); | [A]US2015365731 (MILLER CRAIG [US], et al); | [A]US2016164173 (NAYM GUY [IL], et al) | by applicant | US5419521 | EP1025618 | US6151496 | WO0231915 | EP2789050 |