EP3753836 - ELECTRIC ASSIST DEVICE FOR BICYCLES AND BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUKAMOTO Kenji c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
NAMIKI Yoshihiro c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
HONDA Satoshi c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
KIKUCHI Hiroyuki c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Herzog, Markus Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19764761.3 | 05.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019JP04112 | Priority number, date | JP20180039072 | 05.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018039072 | [2020/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019171860 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753836 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753836 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62M6/55, B62M9/10, B62M3/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
B62M9/105 (EP);
B62M6/55 (EP,US);
B62M3/00 (EP);
B62M6/90 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | B62M6/55 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE HILFSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRRÄDER UND FAHRRAD | [2020/52] | English: | ELECTRIC ASSIST DEVICE FOR BICYCLES AND BICYCLE | [2020/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR BICYCLETTES, ET BICYCLETTE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2020 | Translation filed | 14.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 16.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR395307 (ANTOINE DENIER [FR]) [Y] 10 * page 1; figure 1 *[A] 1; | [A]US5772547 (TERADA MASAO [JP]) [A] 1,8,9,11 * column 5; figures 2,3 *; | [X]JPH11303953 (LINK UP KK) [X] 1-4,6,11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-5,10,11 *; | [XYI]US2013032425 (LEE SEN-YUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,4,5,11 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-3,10-17 * [Y] 10 [I] 2,3,8,9; | [XI]CN203172838U (SUZHOU BAFANG MOTOR TECHNOLOGY CO TECHNOLOGY CO LTD LTD) [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * [I] 5; | [A]US2014060212 (TETSUKA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0128]; figures 1,13,14 *; | [A]US2015247767 (TETSUKA TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2016159435 (YEHUDA ARIE LEON [IL], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-5,8 * | International search | [A]US4871042 (HSU CHI-CHU [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * (Family: none) *; | [A]US5242028 (MURPHY LISA J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH09328092 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 6-7, 10-11 * , paragraphs [0028], [0047], fig. 4, 6 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2001260979 (DOUUMANZU KK, et al) [X] 1, 4-5, 11 * , paragraphs [0004], [0017]-[0046], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [Y] 6-7, 11; | [XY]JP2007091159 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC) [X] 1-5, 7, 11 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0032], fig. 1-5 & TW 200838764 A * [Y] 6-7, 11; | [XY]JP2009248668 (CFC KK) [X] 1-4, 7, 10-11 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0031], fig. 1-9 (Family: none) * [Y] 6-7, 10-11; | [XY]JP2013095311 (KOBAYASHI YUKIHIRO) [X] 1-4, 11 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0020], fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 6-7, 11; | [X] - "User manual | INDIEGOGO edition | Version.1.0", Bimoz Installation and operation manual., (20160000), XP055637313 [X] 1, 7, 11 | [A] - "go-e ONwheel Complete Kit User manual", GO-E GMBH, (20160000), XP055637317 [A] 1-11 | Examination | JPH10147283 | - Anonymous, "Bimoz Installation and operation manual.", User manual | INDIEGOGO edition | Version.1.0 |, (20160101), URL: http://tech-writing-graphics.com/wp-content/uploads/2017/01/bimozV1.3.pdf, (20191030), XP055637313 | by applicant | JP2002264881 | JP2007091159 | JP2009248668 |