EP3763104 - IMPLEMENTING PUSH-TO-TALK IN A MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mutualink, Inc. 1269 South Broad Street Wallingford CT 06492 / US | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states Mutualink Inc. 1269 South Broad Street Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZZARELLA, Joseph 110 Doyle Road Tolland, Connecticut 06084 / US | 02 /
LIPMAN, Derrell 30 Champa Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | 03 /
SETLUR, Anand c/o MUTUALINK, INC. 1269 South Broad Street Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 04 /
WENGROVITZ, Michael 1315 Old Marlboro Road Concord, Massachusetts 07142 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19764870.2 | 06.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US20884 | Priority number, date | US201815913121 | 06.03.2018 Original published format: US201815913121 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173429 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763104 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3763104 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/1069, H04L65/403, H04N7/15, H04L65/4061 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H04L65/4061 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/403 (EP,KR,US);
H04N7/152 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H04L65/403, H04L65/4061, H04N7/15 | ||
Former IPC [2021/02] | H04L29/06, H04N7/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON PUSH-TO-TALK IN EINEM MULTIMEDIA-KONFERENZSYSTEM | [2021/02] | English: | IMPLEMENTING PUSH-TO-TALK IN A MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCING SYSTEM | [2021/02] | French: | MISE EN OEUVRE DE MESSAGERIE VOCALE INSTANTANÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CONFÉRENCE MULTIMÉDIA | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 11.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005009006 (KODIAK NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 6 - page 30; figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2006229093 (BHUTIANI GURVESH [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US7694002 (VADLAKONDA SRAVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-6 * | International search | [Y]US2007239885 (VADLAKONDA SRAVAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [Y]US2009143029 (MATSUMOTO NORIHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20* , entire document. *; | [Y]WO2016161599 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document. * | by applicant | WO2005009006 | US2006229093 | US7694002 |