EP3846961 - SHRINK-FIT DEVICE AND METHOD OF HEATING A SHRINK-FIT CHUCK BY INDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/28] | SHRINK-FIT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INDUCTIVELY HEATING UP SHRINK-FIT CHUCKS | ||
[2022/24] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmut Diebold GmbH&Co. Goldring-Werkzeugfabrik An der Sägmühle 4 72417 Jungingen / DE | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEBOLD, Hermann Konstantin-Killmaier-Weg 19 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19765217.5 | 03.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019EP73450 | Priority number, date | DE201810121883 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018121883 | [2021/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020048970 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3846961 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3846961 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23P11/02, H05B6/14, H05B3/06, H05B3/40 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
H05B6/14 (EP,US);
B23P11/027 (EP,US);
H05B3/06 (EP,US);
H05B3/40 (EP);
B23B31/1179 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | B23P11/02, H05B6/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRUMPFGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM INDUKTIVEN AUFHEIZEN VON SCHRUMPFFUTTERN | [2021/28] | English: | SHRINK-FIT DEVICE AND METHOD OF HEATING A SHRINK-FIT CHUCK BY INDUCTION | [2022/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF À AJUSTEMENT FRETTÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION D'UN MANDRIN À AJUSTEMENT FRETTÉ | [2022/30] |
Former [2021/28] | SHRINK-FIT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INDUCTIVELY HEATING UP SHRINK-FIT CHUCKS | ||
Former [2021/28] | APPAREIL D'AJUSTEMENT FRETTÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION DE MANDRINS À AJUSTEMENT FRETTÉ | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 17.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.2023
01.08.2023
ADMISSIBLE Negendanck, Matthias Rennweg 60-62 90489 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/36] | 17.08.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.12.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | GB | 03.09.2023 | IE | 03.09.2023 | LU | 03.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | FR | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
GB | 03.09.2023 | ||
IE | 03.09.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
FR | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
GB | 03.09.2023 | ||
IE | 03.09.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0059676 (INNOVAT GES FUER SONDERMASCHIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18* figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102005014984 (FRANZ HAIMER MASCHB KG [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0047]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE202007000869U (ZOLLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0018]; figure . *; | [Y] - EASTMAN M, SHRINK-FIT TOOLHOLDING, CUTTING TOOL ENGINEERING, CTE PUBLICATIONS, NORTHFIELD, IL, US, PAGE(S) 1 - 05, (19970401), ISSN 0011-4189, XP002949467 [Y] 1-18 * page 5, paragraph 1; figure 3 * | by applicant | DE102012216186 | Opposition | EP1614501 | DE102005014984 | WO2018105395 |