EP3850388 - CLOCK DRIFT DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitech & Development Wireless Sweden AB Färögatan 3 164 51 Kista / SE | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHN, Anders c/o Hitech & Development Wireless Sweden AB Färögatan 3 164 51 KISTA / SE | 02 /
BERGSTEN, Pär c/o Hitech & Development Wireless Sweden AB Färögatan 3 164 51 KISTA / SE | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2024/27] |
Former [2021/29] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19765769.5 | 13.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP74587 | Priority number, date | EP20180194572 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18194572 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020053436 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850388 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3850388 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/06 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
G01S5/02216 (EP,US);
G06F1/08 (US);
G06F1/10 (US);
G06F1/12 (US);
G01S5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAKTABWEICHUNGSBESTIMMUNG | [2021/29] | English: | CLOCK DRIFT DETERMINATION | [2021/29] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE DÉRIVE D'HORLOGE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 08.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007257832 (LOMMEN LAYNE D [US]); | [A]US2010118858 (PISHARODY MOHAN [US]); | Examination | US2008130604 | US2011268097 | US9065580 | US2017195109 | by applicant | US9356931 |