EP3837381 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING LIBRARY ENRICHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLATTER, Andrew F. 19 Granta Park, Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | 02 /
ZHAO, Junhua 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 03 /
DESANTIS, Grace 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 04 /
GROSS, Stephen M. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 05 /
HOGAN, Hayley M. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 06 /
LI, Jian-Sen 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 07 /
MILLER, Oliver J. 19 Granta Park, Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19766121.8 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019US46396 | Priority number, date | US201862764753P | 15.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862764753 P | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020036991 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837381 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6832, C12N15/10, C12Q1/6876 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6832 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6876 (EP,IL,KR);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C40B40/06 (KR);
C12Q2527/101 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER BIBLIOTHEKSANREICHERUNG | [2021/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING LIBRARY ENRICHMENT | [2021/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER L'ENRICHISSEMENT DE BIBLIOTHÈQUES | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 11.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002102554 (UTERMOHLEN JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,12-17,21 * abstract ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0050]; example 1 *; | [XI]WO2014008447 (INTEGRATED DNA TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 19,20,22 * abstract * [I] 23; | [XY]US2014243232 (MEREDITH GAVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,18-20,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0115] * [Y] 9,10,12-17,21; | [XI] - NICOLA BROOKMAN-AMISSAH ET AL, "Increasing On-Target NGS Reads : Use of Adapter Blocking Oligos for In-Solution Hybridization Improves Target Capture Performance", GENETIC ENGINEERING & BIOTECHNOLOGY NEWS, US, (20140315), vol. 34, no. 6, doi:10.1089/gen.34.06.12, ISSN 1935-472X, pages 24 - 24, XP055446516 [X] 19,20,22 * the whole document * [I] 23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/gen.34.06.12 | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | WO9106678 | WO9844151 | WO0018957 | WO2004018497 | WO2005065814 | WO2005068656 | US7057026 | WO2006064199 | WO2007010251 | US7211414 | WO2007123744 | US7315019 | US7329492 | US2008108082 | US7399845 | US7405281 | US7427672 | US7547684 | US7696345 | US7741457 | US8022193 | US8053192 | US8268980 | US8278425 | US8278426 | US2013274117 | US2014031240 | US8846637 | US8846639 | WO2015106941 | US9221864 | US9546368 | US2017044525 | US9574226 | US2017114404 | - BENTLEY et al., Nature, (20080000), vol. 456, pages 53 - 59 | - MAMANOVA et al., Nat. Methods, (20100000), vol. 7, pages 111 - 118 |