EP3799667 - METHOD FOR TREATING HYDROGEN AND OXYGEN-CONTAINING RESIDUAL GASES OF FUEL CELLS AND RESIDUAL GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/14] | METHOD FOR TREATING HYDROGEN-CONTAINING AND OXYGEN-CONTAINING RESIDUAL GASES OF FUEL CELLS, AND RESIDUAL GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM | ||
[2021/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDT, Torsten Nell-Breuning-Straße 16 91301 Forchheim / DE | 02 /
HERTWECK, Markus Ahornweg 5 91083 Baiersdorf / DE | 03 /
PUTSCHKY, Günter Donato-Polli-Str. 42 91056 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
SANDER, Daniel Christian Geranienweg 10 90768 Fürth / DE | 05 /
SIEDLER, Stefan Beethovenstraße 3 91325 Adelsdorf / DE | 06 /
STRAUB, Fabian Neuenbürger Weg 6a 91093 Heßdorf / DE | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 19766178.8 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/14] | WO2019EP72196 | Priority number, date | EP20180189718 | 20.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18189718 | [2021/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020038907 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799667 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799667 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0662, H01M8/04119, H01M8/0438, H01M8/0444, H01M8/04746 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H01M8/04164 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0662 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04089 (US);
H01M8/04365 (US);
H01M8/04402 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0441 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04462 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0447 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG WASSERSTOFFHALTIGER UND SAUERSTOFFHALTIGER RESTGASE VON BRENNSTOFFZELLEN SOWIE RESTGASBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/14] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING HYDROGEN AND OXYGEN-CONTAINING RESIDUAL GASES OF FUEL CELLS AND RESIDUAL GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2021/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DU GAZ RÉSIDUEL CONTENANT DE L'HYDROGÈNE ET DE L'OXYGÈNE DES PILES À COMBUSTIBLE AINSI QUE SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DU GAZ RÉSIDUEL | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/14] | METHOD FOR TREATING HYDROGEN-CONTAINING AND OXYGEN-CONTAINING RESIDUAL GASES OF FUEL CELLS, AND RESIDUAL GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/14] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ RÉSIDUELS PROVENANT DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE CONTENANT DE L'HYDROGÈNE ET DE L'OXYGÈNE, ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ RÉSIDUELS | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 29.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2019 | AL | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | IE | 20.08.2022 | LU | 20.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 20.08.2019 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | CZ | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1323203 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]DE10203028 (BALLARD POWER SYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-13 * paragraphs [0032] - [0045]; figure 1 * [A] 3-5,14,15; | [A]DE10297626T (UTC FUEL CELLS LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3664873 | DE102006026539 | DE102005035743 |