EP3804118 - OPTIMIZED OPERATION OF A MACHINE WITH MULTIPLE DRIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/15] | OPTIMIZED OPERATION OF A MACHINE HAVING A PLURALITY OF DRIVES | ||
[2023/32] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BITTEROLF, David Pohlgäßchen 8 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
RUPPRECHT, Stefan Waldstraße 13 92353 Postbauer-Heng / DE | 03 /
WEDEL, Bernd Schwalbenweg 40 91096 Möhrendorf / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 19766180.4 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019EP72199 | Priority number, date | EP20180190184 | 22.08.2018 Original published format: EP 18190184 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020038910 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804118 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3804118 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/74, H02P29/032 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H02P5/74 (EP,US);
H02P29/032 (EP);
H02P2201/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTER BETRIEB EINER MASCHINE MIT MEHREREN ANTRIEBEN | [2021/15] | English: | OPTIMIZED OPERATION OF A MACHINE WITH MULTIPLE DRIVES | [2023/32] | French: | FONCTIONNEMENT OPTIMISÉ D'UNE MACHINE À PLUSIEURS COMMANDES | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/15] | OPTIMIZED OPERATION OF A MACHINE HAVING A PLURALITY OF DRIVES | ||
Former [2021/15] | FONCTIONNEMENT OPTIMISÉ D'UNE MACHINE À ENTRAÎNEMENTS MULTIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE4330537 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * claims 1-6,12-16 * * column 1 - column 5 *; | [A]US2012306413 (TEZUKA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0074] , [0107] , [0110] * * claims 1,6,12 ** figure 8 * | by applicant | DE4330537 |