EP3850045 - PIGMENT COMPOSITION FOR SEED COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Chemical Corporation 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLL, Jonathan, D. 3710 Carlton Street Cincinnati, OH 45227 / US | 02 /
BENNETT, Jami, Rae 1537 Street Leger Place Cincinnati, OH 45207 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19766403.0 | 28.08.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US48563 | Priority number, date | US201862728923P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862728923 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055591 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850045 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, A01C1/06, A01N25/26 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
C09C1/0081 (EP,US);
A01N25/00 (EP);
C09C1/0084 (EP);
C01P2004/20 (EP);
C01P2004/22 (EP,US);
C01P2004/24 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP);
C01P2006/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | PIGMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SAMENBESCHICHTUNGEN | [2021/29] | English: | PIGMENT COMPOSITION FOR SEED COATINGS | [2021/29] | French: | COMPOSITION PIGMENTAIRE POUR ENROBAGES DE SEMENCES | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 24.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6743285 (ANSELMANN RALF [DE], et al); | [XY]US2008110372 (HOLLMAN AARON M [US], et al); | [YD]WO2017059197 (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]); | [XY]WO2018039199 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US]) | by applicant | WO2017059197 |