EP3747831 - COMPOSITE OXIDE POWDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIOKA, Hiromasa c/o Tokuyama Corporation, 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 02 /
TAIRA, Hiroaki c/o Tokuyama Corporation, 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Osamu c/o Tokuyama Corporation, 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/50] | Agasse, Stéphane, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19766515.1 | 13.03.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019JP10218 | Priority number, date | JP20180047435 | 15.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018047435 | JP20190033177 | 26.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019033177 | [2020/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019177004 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747831 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3747831 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/18, C01B33/145, C01B33/151, C08K9/06, C09C1/30, C09C1/36, // C08K3/34 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C01B33/145 (EP);
C01B33/12 (KR);
C01B33/20 (US);
C01B33/148 (KR);
C01B33/151 (EP);
C01B33/18 (EP);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08K3/34 (EP,KR,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/30 (EP);
C09C1/3081 (US);
C09C1/36 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (KR);
C01B13/363 (US);
C01P2002/70 (KR);
C01P2004/32 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP,KR);
C01P2004/60 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (KR,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/82 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | C01B33/145, C01B33/151 | ||
Former IPC [2020/50] | C01B33/12, C01B33/148 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDOXIDPULVER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/50] | English: | COMPOSITE OXIDE POWDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2020/50] | French: | POUDRE D'OXYDE COMPOSITE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2020 | Translation filed | 03.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 15.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003055601 (ITO OPTICAL IND CO LTD); | [XAI]EP1323673 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]); | [AD]JP2003252616 (TOKUYAMA CORP); | [XDI]JP2012006823 (TOKUYAMA CORP); | [XI]EP2537804 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS6042218 (NIPPON CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JP2003252616 (TOKUYAMA CORP); | [Y]JP2007230789 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [Y]JP2012006823 (TOKUYAMA CORP); | [Y]WO2015016359 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2016190770 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) | by applicant | JP2003252616 | JP2008019157 | JP2012006823 |