EP3789756 - GLOSS VALUE CALCULATING DEVICE, GLOSS VALUE MEASURING DEVICE, COLOR TONE QUANTIFYING DEVICE FOR GLOSSY COLOR, AND GLOSS VALUE CALCULATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIWATA, Takumi c/o Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 02 /
TAMURA, Kishio c/o Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19766643.1 | 15.03.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019JP10814 | Priority number, date | JP20180049575 | 16.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018049575 | [2021/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019177145 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3789756 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/57 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/57 (EP,US);
G01N21/4738 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | G01N21/57, G01J3/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | GLANZWERTBERECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, GLANZWERTMESSVORRICHTUNG, FARBTON-QUANTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR GLANZFARBE UND GLANZWERTBERECHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/10] | English: | GLOSS VALUE CALCULATING DEVICE, GLOSS VALUE MEASURING DEVICE, COLOR TONE QUANTIFYING DEVICE FOR GLOSSY COLOR, AND GLOSS VALUE CALCULATING METHOD | [2021/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL DE VALEUR DE BRILLANT, DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE VALEUR DE BRILLANT, DISPOSITIF DE QUANTIFICATION DE TON DE COULEUR POUR COULEUR BRILLANTE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL DE VALEUR DE BRILLANT | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2020 | Translation filed | 04.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 18.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61145436 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [A] 8 * figure 7 *; | [XI]JPS61230045 (AIDA TEIZO) [X] 1-4,6,13 * Equation 1;; figures 1, 2 * [I] 5,7-12; | [XI]JPH11142331 (SHINJU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1,3,13 * paragraphs [0019] - [0037]; figures 1, 4 * [I] 2,4-12; | [A]US2002171826 (WILES GREGORY R [US], et al) [A] 8 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] *; | [A]US2007201029 (JINNO TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] 7 * paragraph [0112] *; | [XDI]JP2011162886 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [XD] 1,3,4,6,11,13 * figures 1,4 * [I] 5,7-10,12; | [XI] - T ET AL, "Method for Measuring the Glossiness of Curved Surfaces Using Charge-Coupled-Device Line Sensor", Electronics and Communications in Japan, (19851101), pages 933 - 941, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/ecjb.4420690611/asset/4420690611_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=ijlle73n&s=4cd3b499a6e78bbf81b4366885a65b51a053bfe2, (20160119), XP055242864 [X] 1-4,6,13 * Equation 7;; figure 6 * [I] 5-12 | [I] - C. PASSARO ET AL, "Gloss evaluation and prediction of achromatic low-gloss textured surfaces from the automotive industry", COLOR RESEARCH & APPLICATION, US, (20150207), vol. 41, no. 2, doi:10.1002/col.21946, ISSN 0361-2317, pages 154 - 164, XP055286106 [I] 1-13 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/col.21946 | [A] - MATSUMOTO TOMOHISA ET AL, "Appearance of Gold, Silver and Copper Colors of Glossy Object Surface", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF AFFECTIVE ENGINEERING, vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.5057/ijae.IJAE-D-16-00003, (20160331), pages 239 - 247, URL: https://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/ijae/advpub/0/advpub_IJAE-D-16-00003/_pdf/-char/en, XP055789153 [A] 12 * figure 6a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5057/ijae.IJAE-D-16-00003 | International search | [A]JPH03170810 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-13 * (Family: none) *; | [A]GB2277148 (FEATHER JAMES WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-13* (Family: none) *; | [XY]JPH11142331 (SHINJU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1-3, 13 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0037], fig. 1-7 (Family: _ none) * [Y] 1-13; | [A]JP2006261820 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * & US 2006/0210295 A1 *; | [Y]JP2006266763 (CANON KK) [Y] 1-13 * , _ paragraphs [0027]-[0093], fig. 1-9 & US 2007/0201029 A1, paragraphs [0069]-[0134], fig. 1-9 *; | [Y]JP2010243353 (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 12 * , paragraph [0013] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014232098 (NSK LTD) [Y] 5-12 * , paragraph [0079], fig. 24 & US 2016/0069798 A1, paragraph [0160], fig. 25 *; | [A]JP2015049691 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * & US 2016/0371880 A1 *; | [Y]JP2015068813 (CANON KK) [Y] 7-12 * , paragraph [0026] (Family: none * | by applicant | WO2005075961 | JP2011162886 | JP2016197035 | JP2018049575 |