Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3764919 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3764919



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(62)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 289
28.01.2025 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.01.2025 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.01.2025 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.01.2025 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.01.2025 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 45
28.01.2025 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 45
20.03.2024 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
14.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.03.2024 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 1
09.02.2024 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
09.02.2024 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.02.2024 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
24.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.07.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
24.07.2023 Claims Search / examination 2
24.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.07.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.04.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.04.2023 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.03.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.01.2023 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2022 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 2
11.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.07.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
11.07.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
11.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.01.2022 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.12.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.12.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 7
17.12.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.12.2021 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 6
02.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.12.2021 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
04.11.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
04.11.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
04.11.2021 Partial European search report Search / examination 5
04.11.2021 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 5
21.10.2021 Search started Search / examination 1
23.12.2020 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.10.2020 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.10.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.09.2020 Annex Search / examination 1
25.09.2020 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
25.09.2020 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.07.2020 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.02.2020 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
18.02.2020 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.10.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
19.09.2019 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
19.09.2019 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 49