EP3766601 - TITANIUM POWDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toho Technical Service Co., Ltd. 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki City, Kanagawa 253-0041 / JP | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKENAKA Shigehisa c/o TOHO TECHNICAL SERVICE CO., LTD. 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki City, Kanagawa 2530041 / JP | 02 /
HIRASHIMA Kenji c/o TOHO TECHNICAL SERVICE CO., LTD. 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki City, Kanagawa 2530041 / JP | 03 /
TAKI Kazuhiro c/o TOHO TECHNICAL SERVICE CO., LTD. 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki City, Kanagawa 2530041 / JP | 04 /
SAITO Kazuya c/o Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-70, Konan 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8224 / JP | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Prüfeninger Straße 21 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Stromerstr. 2A 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19767251.2 | 06.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019JP08968 | Priority number, date | JP20180049468 | 16.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018049468 | [2021/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019176700 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766601 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F9/04, B22F9/02, C22C1/04 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
C22C1/0458 (EP,US);
B22F1/00 (EP,US);
B22F9/023 (EP);
B22F9/04 (EP);
B22F2009/048 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | B22F1/00, B22F9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | TITANPULVER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/03] | English: | TITANIUM POWDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2021/03] | French: | POUDRE DE TITANE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2020 | Translation filed | 06.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6168644 (FUKASAWA EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2 - column 6 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-5 *[Y] 6; | [XYI]JP2013112878 (TOHO TITANIUM CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [000+] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * claims 1-2 * [Y] 6 [I] 6; | [X] - MCCRACKEN C G ET AL, "Key characteristics of hydride-dehydride titanium powder", POWDER METALLURGY., GB, vol. 54, no. 3, doi:10.1179/174329011X13045076771849, ISSN 0032-5899, (20110701), pages 180 - 183, URL: https://www.tandfonline.com/doi/pdf/10.1179/174329011X13045076771849, (20211021), XP055853660 [X] 1,2 * Section "Powder Morphology"; page 180 - page 181 * * figure Fig. 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1179/174329011X13045076771849 | International search | [YA]JPH01139706 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1, 2 * , * [A] 3-6; | [A]JPH0593213 (SUMITOMO SHICHITSUKUSU KK) [A] 1-6* , *; | [Y]JP2001262246 (TOHO TITANIUM CO LTD) [Y] 3-5 * , *; | [YA]JP2013112878 (TOHO TITANIUM CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * , * [A] 6 | by applicant | JPH05247503 | JPH07278601 |