EP3734717 - CERIA-CARBON-SULFUR COMPOSITE, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND POSITIVE ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM-SULFUR BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | For all designated states Sogang University Research Foundation 35 Baekbeom-ro Mapo-gu Seoul 04107 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | ||
For all designated states Sogang University Research Foundation 35 Baekbeom-ro Mapo-gu Seoul 04107 / KR | |||
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | ||
For all designated states Sogang University Research Foundation 35 Baekbeom-ro Mapo-gu Seoul 04107 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Seungbo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
SOHN, Kwonnam LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Jun Hyuk 103-603, 60-7, Mokdongnam-ro, 2-gil, Yangcheon-gu Seoul 08105 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Doo Kyung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
GUEON, Donghee Rm.401, 20, Baekbeom-ro, 17-gil, Mapo-gu Seoul 04137 / KR | 06 /
HWANG, Jeong Tae 815-904, 84, Gwanjeo-ro, Seo-gu Daejeon 35373 / KR | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 19767567.1 | 13.03.2019 | [2020/45] | WO2019KR02879 | Priority number, date | KR20180030737 | 16.03.2018 Original published format: KR 20180030737 | [2020/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019177355 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734717 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/485, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, C01F17/00, C01B32/158, C01B17/02 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H01M4/364 (EP,KR,US);
C01B17/02 (KR);
C01B32/05 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M4/0416 (US);
H01M4/0471 (US);
H01M4/362 (US);
H01M4/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/48 (KR);
H01M4/583 (KR);
H01M4/625 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (KR);
C01P2006/16 (KR);
H01M2004/021 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | CEROXID-KOHLENSTOFFSCHWEFEL-VERBUNDSTOFF, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG, POSITIVE ELEKTRODE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE LITHIUM-SCHWEFEL BATTERIE | [2020/45] | English: | CERIA-CARBON-SULFUR COMPOSITE, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND POSITIVE ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM-SULFUR BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2020/45] | French: | COMPOSITE OXYDE DE CÉRIUM-CARBONE-SOUFRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE ET BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-SOUFRE COMPRENANT LADITE ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2020 | Translation filed | 27.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN107293715 (SHANXI INST COAL CHEMISTRY CAS); | International search | [A]KR20150124301 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [X]CN107293715 (SHANXI INST COAL CHEMISTRY CAS); | [Y]KR20170142425 (UNIV SOGANG RES FOUNDATION [KR]); | by applicant | KR20180030737 | CN108417852 |