EP3767638 - RADIONUCLIDE PREPARATION SYSTEM, STORAGE MEDIUM READABLE BY COMPUTER STORING RADIONUCLIDE PREPARATION PROGRAM, RADIONUCLIDE PREPARATION METHOD, AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 5650871 / JP | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINOHARA, Atsushi c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY, 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 02 /
TOYOSHIMA, Atsushi c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 03 /
ZHANG, Zijian c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 04 /
KANDA, Akimitsu c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 05 /
ICHIMURA, Soichiro c/o OSAKA UNIVERSITY 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19768003.6 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019JP08043 | Priority number, date | JP20180048560 | 15.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018048560 | [2021/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019176585 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767638 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G21G1/00, G21G4/08 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G21G1/0005 (EP,US);
G21G1/001 (US);
G21G2001/0094 (EP,US);
G21G4/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | G21G4/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | RADIONUKLIDHERSTELLUNGSSYSTEM, SPEICHERMEDIUM, DAS VON EINEM COMPUTER LESBAR IST, DER EIN PROGRAMM ZUR RADIONUKLIDHERSTELLUNG SPEICHERT, RADIONUKLIDHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/03] | English: | RADIONUCLIDE PREPARATION SYSTEM, STORAGE MEDIUM READABLE BY COMPUTER STORING RADIONUCLIDE PREPARATION PROGRAM, RADIONUCLIDE PREPARATION METHOD, AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉPARATION DE RADIONUCLÉIDES, SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR STOCKANT UN PROGRAMME DE PRÉPARATION DE RADIONUCLÉIDES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE RADIONUCLÉIDES ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | Translation filed | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4681727 (MIRZADEH SAED [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US5102651 (WILBUR DANIEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-14* figures 1,3; claim - *; | [A]EP3157577 (LINDEGREN STURE [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure -; claim - *; | [A] - EMMA ANEHEIM ET AL, "Automated astatination of biomolecules - a stepping stone towards multicenter clinical trials", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20150714), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/srep12025, pages 1 - 11, XP055245286 [A] 1-14 * Section: Methods;; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep12025 | International search | [A]WO2006074960 (EUROPEAN ORGANISATION NUCLEAR RESEARCH CERN [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2009/0162278 A1 & GB 2436508 A & CA 2594829 A1 *; | [A]WO2012039037 (NAT INST RADIOLOG [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire text, all drawings & EP 2620950 A1, whole document *; | [A]WO2014057900 (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016080574 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-14 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2017/0323696 A1, whole document & WO 2016/063774 A1 *; | [A]JP2016166764 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-14 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2017093069 (AREVA MED SAS [FR]) [A] 1-14* , entire text, all drawings & US 2018/0350480 A1 & EP 3174068 A1 & CA 3004689 A1 * |