EP3767603 - HELMET-MOUNTED EMERGENCY EVACUATION WARNING DEVICE, AND EMERGENCY EVACUATION WARNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Midori Anzen Co., Ltd. 4-3, Hiroo 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOZAWA, Makoto c/o MIDORI ANZEN CO., LTD. 4-3, Hiroo 5-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | 02 /
MASUKO, Takashi c/o MIDORI ANZEN CO., LTD. 4-3, Hiroo 5-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | 03 /
SHIMBO, Takatomo c/o MIDORI ANZEN CO., LTD. 4-3, Hiroo 5-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | 04 /
TAKASUGI, Shuichi c/o MIDORI ANZEN CO., LTD. 4-3, Hiroo 5-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8455 / JP | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19768334.5 | 13.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019JP10226 | Priority number, date | JP20180045530 | 13.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018045530 | [2021/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019177007 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767603 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/10, A42B3/04, G08B21/02, G08B25/00, G08B27/00, G08B6/00 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
G08B6/00 (EP);
G08B27/001 (EP);
A42B3/0433 (EP);
G08B25/009 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | G08B25/10, A42B3/04, G08B21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | AN EINEM HELM MONTIERTE NOTFALLEVAKUIERUNGSWARNVORRICHTUNG UND NOTFALLEVAKUIERUNGSWARNSYSTEM | [2021/03] | English: | HELMET-MOUNTED EMERGENCY EVACUATION WARNING DEVICE, AND EMERGENCY EVACUATION WARNING SYSTEM | [2021/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AVERTISSEMENT D'ÉVACUATION D'URGENCE MONTÉ SUR UN CASQUE, ET SYSTÈME D'AVERTISSEMENT D'ÉVACUATION D'URGENCE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2020 | Translation filed | 07.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 04.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/46] | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008085511 (CABRERA RONALD J [US]) [Y] 2,3,5,6,13 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2010005045 (HIROSHIGE HATSUNORI [JP]) [Y] 10 * page 9 - lines 25-29; figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US2014361881 (REILLY BRICK ARTHUR JAY [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0022] , [0025] , [0037]; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,10,12,13 [I] 4,7-9,11,14; | [Y]WO2017037451 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [Y] 12,13* page 1; claims 1,9a * | International search | [A]JP3022658U (LIN, Runfa) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0008]-[0009], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001333478 (TEMCO JAPAN) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0002], [0008]-[0012], [0015], fig. 5 & WO 2001/091509 A1 *; | [A]JP2008174886 (TANIZAWA SEISAKUSHO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0003]-[0006], [0013], [0026], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011192033 (NAT INST OF OCCUPATION SAFETY & HEALTH JAPAN, et al) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0019], [0032]-[0033], fig. 1-2, 9 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013218618 (KAMIKITA KENSETSU KK, et al) [A] 1-14* , paragraphs [0014]-[0022], [0040]-[0048], fig. 1, 5-6 (Family: none) *; | [A]CN106889996 (UNIV JILIANG CHINA) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0016], fig. 2 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2007247097 | JP2009167587 | JP2013238058 | JP2014153876 | JP3200747U |