EP3830408 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE BREAKDOWN VOLTAGE BETWEEN THE ELECTRODES OF A SPARK PLUG CONNECTED TO AN IGNITION COIL FOR A CYLINDER IGNITION SYSTEM IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eldor Corporation S.p.A. Via Don Paolo Berra 18 22030 Orsenigo (Como) / IT | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORTE, Pasquale C/o Eldor Corporation S.p.A. Via Don Paolo Berra 18 22030 Orsenigo (Como) / IT | 02 /
ALBI, Marco C/o Eldor Corporation S.p.A. Via Don Paolo Berra 18 22030 Orsenigo (Como) / IT | 03 /
POZZI, Pierluigi C/o Eldor Corporation S.p.A. Via Don Paolo Berra 18 22030 Orsenigo (Como) / IT | 04 /
SILVA, Stefano C/o Eldor Corporation S.p.A. Via Don Paolo Berra 18 22030 Orsenigo (Como) / IT | 05 /
CARUGATI, Eugenio C/o Eldor Corporation S.p.A. Via Don Paolo Berra 18 22030 Orsenigo (Como) / IT | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Zermani Biondi Orsi, Umberto Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Zermani, Umberto Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19768902.9 | 30.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019IB56469 | Priority number, date | IT20180007781 | 02.08.2018 Original published format: IT201800007781 | [2021/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026128 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830408 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02P17/12, F02P3/05 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
F02P17/12 (EP,US);
F02P3/051 (EP,US);
H01T13/58 (US);
H01T13/60 (US);
F02P2017/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG DER DURCHBRUCHSPANNUNG ZWISCHEN DEN ELEKTRODEN EINER MIT EINER ZÜNDSPULE VERBUNDENEN ZÜNDKERZE FÜR EIN ZYLINDERZÜNDSYSTEM EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2021/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE BREAKDOWN VOLTAGE BETWEEN THE ELECTRODES OF A SPARK PLUG CONNECTED TO AN IGNITION COIL FOR A CYLINDER IGNITION SYSTEM IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2021/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE LA TENSION DE CLAQUAGE ENTRE LES ÉLECTRODES D'UNE BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE CONNECTÉE À UNE BOBINE D'ALLUMAGE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ALLUMAGE DE CYLINDRE DANS UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 28.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0555851 (WEBER SRL [IT]); | [A]EP0652363 (CHRYSLER CORP [US]); | [A]US5513620 (PYKO JAN S [US], et al); | [A]JP2000038978 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO); | [A]US6236213 (MARUTA NAOYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2018038338 (SUGIURA AKIMITSU [JP], et al) |