Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023282923 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117367542 | 05.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020159581 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020159580 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382051 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020159579 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382034 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020149890 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916354040 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020149889 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020149886 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019177698 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019108334 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024282369 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318124334 | 21.03.2023 | US202117471099 | 09.09.2021 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US202418645184 | 24.04.2024 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024274187 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318124334 | 21.03.2023 | US202117471099 | 09.09.2021 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US202418645018 | 24.04.2024 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024274186 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318124334 | 21.03.2023 | US202117471099 | 09.09.2021 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US202418644840 | 24.04.2024 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024095509 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117367633 | 06.07.2021 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US202318520500 | 27.11.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024095508 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117367633 | 06.07.2021 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US202318520277 | 27.11.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021342682 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US202117367633 | 06.07.2021 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12033692 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | B2 | US2023223077 | 13.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318124334 | 21.03.2023 | US202117471099 | 09.09.2021 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11893478 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B2 | US2021334639 | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | US202117367542 | 05.07.2021 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11646075 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2023 | B2 | US2021407588 | 30.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117471099 | 09.09.2021 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11500442 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2022 | B2 | US2020234111 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11409352 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2022 | B2 | US2020233482 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916354040 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11270771 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2022 | B2 | US2020242453 | 30.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382051 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11087207 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2021 | B2 | US2019286976 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10803943 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2020 | B2 | US2019237142 | 01.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382034 | 11.04.2019 | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10748630 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | B2 | US2019164617 | 30.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020243139 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2020 | A1 | US10720217 | 21.07.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10699779 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | B2 | US2019237136 | 01.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916382013 | 11.04.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240029074 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117367542 | 05.07.2021 | WO2021US53644 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230163572 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | KR20237010513 | 24.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102657246B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2024 | B1 | KR20210107100 | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | WO2019US49922 | 06.09.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102607530B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2023 | B1 | KR20210110354 | 07.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382051 | 11.04.2019 | WO2019US48934 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102607529B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2023 | B1 | KR20210107796 | 01.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48933 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102604405B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2023 | B1 | KR20230044340 | 03.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20207022363 | 24.01.2019 | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102599243B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2023 | B1 | KR20210107101 | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US50088 | 06.09.2019 | US201916354040 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102516399B | Global Dossier | 30.03.2023 | B1 | KR20200102506 | 31.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102407363B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2022 | B1 | KR20210105428 | 26.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48935 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102350215B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2022 | B1 | KR20210090275 | 19.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48420 | 27.08.2019 | US201916382013 | 11.04.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102350213B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2022 | B1 | KR20210095712 | 02.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48929 | 29.08.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382034 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102331445B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | B1 | KR20200060739 | 01.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024526147 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117367542 | 05.07.2021 | WO2021US53644 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023093463 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | JP2020548740 | 24.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7492042B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2024 | B2 | JP2023052302 | 11.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020529370 | 30.10.2018 | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7270746B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2023 | B2 | JP2022523292 | 22.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48420 | 27.08.2019 | US201916382013 | 11.04.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7346579B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | B2 | JP2022523291 | 22.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | WO2019US49922 | 06.09.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7391097B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2023 | B2 | JP2022522987 | 21.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48933 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7270747B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2023 | B2 | JP2022519494 | 24.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48929 | 29.08.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382034 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7314286B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | B2 | JP2022519041 | 18.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382051 | 11.04.2019 | WO2019US48934 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7340612B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2023 | B2 | JP2022517810 | 10.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US50088 | 06.09.2019 | US201916354040 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022514111 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2022 | A | JP7008167B | 25.01.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48935 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7253563B | Global Dossier | 06.04.2023 | B2 | JP2021517705 | 26.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7210585B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2023 | B2 | JP2021504868 | 15.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4367665 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117367542 | 05.07.2021 | WO2021US53644 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4303772 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2024 | A3 | EP4303772 | 10.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | EP19766740 | 24.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4235671 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | A3 | EP4235671 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | EP19773599 | 06.09.2019 | WO2019US49922 | 06.09.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4116979 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18884336 | 30.10.2018 | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3918534 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | B1 | EP3918534 | 08.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48935 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3918533 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2022 | B1 | EP3918533 | 08.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382051 | 11.04.2019 | WO2019US48934 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3918532 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2023 | B1 | EP3918532 | 08.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48929 | 29.08.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382034 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3912103 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2023 | B1 | EP3912103 | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | WO2019US49922 | 06.09.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3912102 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2023 | B1 | EP3912102 | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US50088 | 06.09.2019 | US201916354040 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3912100 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2022 | B1 | EP3912100 | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48420 | 27.08.2019 | US201916382013 | 11.04.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3766178 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | B1 | EP3766178 | 15.12.2021 | A4 | EP3766178 | 20.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3676840 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2022 | B1 | EP3676840 | 18.08.2021 | A4 | EP3676840 | 08.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117581300 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117367542 | 05.07.2021 | WO2021US53644 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117292731 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201880076120 | 30.10.2018 | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115511068 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201980090606 | 29.08.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48935 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113366506 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382051 | 11.04.2019 | WO2019US48934 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113366505B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2022 | B | CN113366505 | 07.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48935 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113366504B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | B | CN113366504 | 07.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48929 | 29.08.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382034 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113366503B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2022 | B | CN113366503 | 07.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48420 | 27.08.2019 | US201916382013 | 11.04.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113330461 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48933 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113316793 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US50088 | 06.09.2019 | US201916354040 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113302629 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | WO2019US49922 | 06.09.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111886804 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111386572B | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | B | CN111386572 | 07.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3912101 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2023 | B1 | EP3912101 | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48933 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI694448B | 21.05.2020 | B | TW201933361 | 16.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI717703B | 01.02.2021 | B | TW201941209 | 16.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI719757B | 21.02.2021 | B | TW202030649 | 16.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48933 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI740487B | 21.09.2021 | B | TW202030735 | 16.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715826345 | 29.11.2017 | WO2018US58297 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI737078B | 21.08.2021 | B | TW202032561 | 01.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916353830 | 14.03.2019 | WO2019US49922 | 06.09.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI716222B | 11.01.2021 | B | TW202032562 | 01.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US50088 | 06.09.2019 | US201916354040 | 14.03.2019 | US201962814813 | 06.03.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202042116 | 16.11.2020 | A | TWI705389B | 21.09.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48929 | 29.08.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382034 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202042117 | 16.11.2020 | A | TWI705390B | 21.09.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382051 | 11.04.2019 | WO2019US48934 | 29.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI732414B | 01.07.2021 | B | TW202042118 | 16.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | WO2019US48935 | 29.08.2019 | US201916382060 | 11.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI737079B | 21.08.2021 | B | TW202046183 | 16.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US48420 | 27.08.2019 | US201916382013 | 11.04.2019 | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI764503B | 11.05.2022 | B | TW202131337 | 16.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US15022 | 24.01.2019 | US201815991890 | 29.05.2018 | US201862642884 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI841981B | 11.05.2024 | B | TW202307741 | 16.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117367542 | 05.07.2021 | WO2021US53644 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020149887 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11270763 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2022 | B2 | US2020234758 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962798417 | 29.01.2019 | US201916382045 | 11.04.2019 | US201962794492 | 18.01.2019 |