EP3850058 - METHOD FOR TREATING A LUMINESCENT MATERIAL COMPRISING ORGANIC LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seaborough IP I B.V. Science Park 106, 3rd Floor 1098 XG Amsterdam / NL | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMES, Michael 2625 Middlefield Road Nr. 687 Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
VAN DE HAAR, Marie Anne Keverdijk 8 1381 HL Weesp / NL | 03 /
BERENDS, Anne Claire Seringstraat 21 3551 TJ Utrecht / NL | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19769149.6 | 13.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019EP74572 | Priority number, date | EP20180194535 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18194535 | EP20180194532 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18194532 | EP20190153094 | 22.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19153094 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020053429 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3850058 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/77, H05B33/14, H05B33/18 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
C09K11/7774 (EP,US);
C09K11/025 (EP);
C09K11/7794 (EP);
C09K11/7795 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES LUMINESZIERENDEN MATERIALS MIT ORGANISCHEN LIGANDEN | [2021/29] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING A LUMINESCENT MATERIAL COMPRISING ORGANIC LIGANDS | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN MATÉRIAU LUMINESCENT COMPRENANT DES LIGANDS ORGANIQUES | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 07.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006054863 (DAI SHENG [US], et al); | [I]US2010159249 (JANG EUN JOO [KR], et al); | [XI]EP3255119 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | by applicant | WO2018EP56660 |