EP3966662 - REDUCING A STATE BASED ON IMU AND RADAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDEL, Alok 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
GIUSTI, Leonardo 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
TSURKAN, Artur 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
CINEK, Selim Flavio 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 05 /
PRAG, Johan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 06 /
KUGLER, Tyler Reed 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 07 /
MOREIRA COSTA, Lucas Dupin 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 08 /
SACHIDANANDAM, Vignesh 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 09 /
BARBELLO, Brandon 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 19769329.4 | 30.08.2019 | [2022/11] | WO2019US49212 | Priority number, date | US201962879361P | 26.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879361 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021219 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966662 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3966662 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/3231, G01S7/41, G01S13/06, G01S13/42, G06F3/01 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G06F1/3231 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/415 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/003 (EP,KR);
G01S13/282 (EP,KR);
G01S13/42 (EP,KR);
G01S13/56 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/726 (EP,KR);
G01S13/86 (EP,US);
G01S13/88 (EP);
G01S7/038 (EP,KR);
G01S7/2813 (EP,KR);
G01S7/2921 (EP,KR);
G01S7/2923 (EP,KR);
G06F21/31 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP);
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06V40/20 (EP,US);
H04W52/00 (US);
G01S13/44 (EP);
G01S13/584 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDUZIERUNG EINES ZUSTANDS BASIEREND AUF IMU UND RADAR | [2022/11] | English: | REDUCING A STATE BASED ON IMU AND RADAR | [2022/11] | French: | RÉDUCTION D'UN ÉTAT BASÉ SUR UNE IMU ET UN RADAR | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 08.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013316687 (SUBBARAMOO SHOBHA M [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,13,16 * paragraphs [0036] - [0096] * [I] 2-8,11,12,14,15; | [A]US2014124647 (HSU EN-FENG [TW]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0018] - [0025] *; | [A]US2017289766 (SCOTT JAMES WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0031] - [0106] * | Examination | US2016282934 |