EP3867140 - FLOATING MODULE OF A FLOATING STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR JOINING SUCH FLOATING MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safier Ingenierie 13 Cours du Danube 77700 Serris / FR | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAFIER, Elchanan Les Cerisiers Route Dauphin 77580 CRECY LA CHAPELLE / FR | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Ex Materia 2, rue Hélène Boucher 78280 Guyancourt / FR | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19769541.4 | 20.09.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP75403 | Priority number, date | FR20180059672 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: FR 1859672 | [2021/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078662 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867140 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3867140 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/38, E02B3/06 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B63B35/38 (EP,RU,US);
B63B5/18 (RU);
B63B35/34 (KR);
B63B35/44 (RU,US);
E02B3/064 (EP,KR,US);
B63B2231/02 (KR);
B63B2231/60 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWIMMMODUL EINER SCHWIMMENDEN STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG SOLCHER SCHWIMMENDEN MODULE | [2021/34] | English: | FLOATING MODULE OF A FLOATING STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR JOINING SUCH FLOATING MODULES | [2021/34] | French: | MODULE FLOTTANT D'UNE STRUCTURE FLOTTANTE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE TELS MODULES FLOTTANTS | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 12.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23219703.8 / EP4328386 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | RS | 07.05.2024 | [2024/34] | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3091203 (USAB ERNEST M); | [A]FR2597826 (GEY ROBERT [FR]); | [XI]US2016214683 (SIMOLA CHARLES [US]) |