Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024208617 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117282023 | 01.04.2021 | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | US202418440327 | 13.02.2024 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11932359 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2024 | B2 | US2021347447 | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210079337 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024099521 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021546454 | 20.09.2019 | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7465274B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2024 | B2 | JP2022508883 | 19.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4328386 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | A3 | EP4328386 | 28.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP19769541 | 20.09.2019 | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113226915 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019360540 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3867140 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2024 | C0 | EP3867140 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2024 | B1 | EP3867140 | 25.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021007163 | 20.07.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3867140T | 08.07.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2763089 | 27.12.2021 | C1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019EP75403 | 20.09.2019 | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020078662 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3087412 | 02.04.2021 | B1 | FR3087412 | 24.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1859672 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Divisional application | EP4328386 |