EP3847463 - DENDRITIC DETERGENTS FOR THE ANALYSIS OF PROTEINS BY MASS SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Oxford, OX2 0JB / GB | For all designated states Freie Universität Berlin Kaiserswerther Straße 16-18 14195 Berlin / DE | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Carol V. University of Oxford Chemistry Research Laboratory 12 Mansfield Road Oxford OX1 3TA / GB | 02 /
LIKO, Idlir University of Oxford Chemistry Research Laboratory 12 Mansfield Road Oxford OX1 3TA / GB | 03 /
YEN, Hsin-Yung University of Oxford Chemistry Research Laboratory 12 Mansfield Road Oxford OX1 3TA / GB | 04 /
PAGEL, Kevin Freie Universität Berlin Institute of Chemistry and Biochemistry Takustraße 3 14195 Berlin / DE | 05 /
HAAG, Rainer Freie Universität Berlin Institute of Chemistry and Biochemistry Takustraße 3 14195 Berlin / DE | 06 /
EHRMANN, Svenja Christina Freie Universität Berlin Institute of Chemistry and Biochemistry Takustraße 3 14195 Berlin / DE | 07 /
URNER, Leonhard Hagen Freie Universität Berlin Institute of Chemistry and Biochemistry Takustraße 3 14195 Berlin / DE | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Stratagem IPM Limited Meridian Court Comberton Road Toft, Cambridge CB23 2RY / GB | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19769553.9 | 04.09.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019GB52462 | Priority number, date | GB20180014356 | 04.09.2018 Original published format: GB 201814356 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020049294 | Date: | 12.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3847463 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3847463 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C08G83/00 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
C07K1/145 (US);
H01J49/0031 (US);
H01J49/165 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DENDRITISCHE DETERGENZIEN ZUR ANALYSE VON PROTEINEN MITTELS MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE | [2023/46] | English: | DENDRITIC DETERGENTS FOR THE ANALYSIS OF PROTEINS BY MASS SPECTROMETRY | [2021/28] | French: | DÉTERGENTS DENDRITIQUES POUR L'ANALYSE DES PROTÉINES PAR SPECTROMETRIE DE MASSE | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/28] | DENDRITISCHE DETERGENZIEN ZUR ANALYSE VON PROTEINEN DURCH MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE | ||
Former [2021/28] | DÉTERGENTS DENDRITIQUES POUR L'ANALYSE DE PROTÉINES PAR SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 01.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP1666486 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [X] 22,23 * see [0007, 0009-0021] * [A] 1-21,25 [I] 24; | [XDAY]WO2010000713 (UNIV BERLIN FREIE [DE], et al) [XD] 22,23 * see p. 3-7, 14-16, compounds of example 2, claims * [A] 1-21,25 [Y] 24; | [YA]WO2017149294 (UNIV OXFORD INNOVATION LTD [GB]) [Y] 24 * see p. 2-3, 7-8, 11, 14-16, 18 * [A] 1-21,25; | [YA]WO2018154318 (UNIV OXFORD INNOVATION LTD [GB]) [Y] 24 * see p. 3, 6-8, 11-13, 15-20 * [A] 1-21,25; | [XP] - URNER LEONHARD H ET AL, "Exploring the Potential of Dendritic Oligoglycerol Detergents for Protein Mass Spectrometry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, vol. 30, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S13361-018-2063-2, ISSN 1044-0305, (20181001), pages 174 - 180, (20181001), XP036725564 [XP] 1-25 * see Scheme 1, p. 174-176 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13361-018-2063-2 | [XP] - L.H. Urner, "Oligoglycerol detergents for native mass spectrometry of membrane proteins", (20180925), Ph.D. Thesis - Freie Universität Berlin, URL: http://hdl.handle.net/21.11116/00000004-556C-4, (20191106), XP002795451 [XP] 1-25 * abstract * | [YA] - KALLOL GUPTA ET AL, "Identifying key membrane protein lipid interactions using mass spectrometry", NATURE PROTOCOLS, GB, (20180426), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nprot.2018.014, ISSN 1754-2189, pages 1106 - 1120, XP055639602 [Y] 24 * see Figs. 1-2, experimental design * [A] 1-21,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2018.014 | [YA] - M. Landreh et al, "Effect of detergent micelles on lipid binding to proteins in electrospray ionization mass spectrometry", Analytical Chemistry, vol. 89, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.7b00922, (20170619), pages 7425 - 7430, Analytical Chemistry, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/full/10.1021/acs.analchem.7b00922, (20191106), XP002795452 [Y] 24 * see p. 7425-7427 * [A] 1-21,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.7b00922 | [A] - JIAHUI LIU ET AL, "Affinity Enhancement by Ligand Clustering Effect Inspired by Peptide Dendrimers-Shank PDZ Proteins Interactions", PLOS ONE, (20160226), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0149580, page e0149580, XP055639621 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0149580 | Examination | - Matar-Merheb Rima ET AL, "Structuring Detergents for Extracting and Stabilizing Functional Membrane Proteins", PLoS ONE, (20110331), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0018036, page e18036, XP093073787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0018036 | by applicant | WO2010000713 | WO2012172378 | WO2014096821 | - WYSZOGRODZKA et al., Chem. Eur. J., (20080000), vol. 14, pages 9202 - 9214 | - THOTA et al., Chem. Commun., (20150000), vol. 51, pages 8648 - 8651 | - BARRERA et al., Nat. Methods, (20090000), vol. 6, pages 585 - 587 | - DREW, Nat. Protoc., (20080000), vol. 3, pages 784 - 798 | - ALLER et al., Science, (20090000), vol. 323, pages 1718 - 1722 | - ZHANG et al., Nature, (20150000), vol. 520, page 317 | - WILM et al., Anal. Chem., (19960000), vol. 68, pages 1 - 8 | - WILM et al., Int. J. of Mass Spec. and Ion Proc., (19940000), vol. 132, pages 167 - 180 | - LAGANOWSKY et al., Nat. Protoc., (20130000), vol. 8, pages 639 - 651 | - SKHIRI, Soft Matter, (20120000), vol. 8, pages 10618 - 10627 | - HOUSDEN, Science, (20130000), vol. 340, no. 6140, pages 1570 - 1574 | - YEN, Nature, (20180000), vol. 559, pages 423 - 427 | - GAULT et al., Nat. Methods, (20160000), vol. 13, pages 333 - 336 | - SARKAR, PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 14808 - 14813 | - YEN et al., Sci. Adv., (20170000), vol. 3, pages 1 - 6 | - SEO et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20160000), vol. 55, pages 14173 - 14176 | - GOTH et al., Analyst., (20160000), vol. 141, pages 5502 - 5510 |