EP3853564 - DETERMINING WEIGHTS OF VEHICLES IN MOTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optics11 B.V. De Boelelaan 1081 1081 HV Amsterdam / NL | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGER, Johannes Maria c/o FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 2264 SG Leidschendam / NL | 02 /
KARABACAK, Devrez Mehmet c/o FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 2264 SG Leidschendam / NL | 03 /
HOPMAN, Lukas Johannes c/o FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 NL SG Leidschendam / NL | [2024/33] |
Former [2021/30] | 01 /
SINGER, Johannes Maria c/o FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 2264 SG Leidschendam / NL | ||
02 /
KARABACAK, Devrez Mehmet c/o FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 2264 SG Leidschendam / NL | |||
03 /
HOPMAN, Lukas Johannes c/o FNV IP B.V. Veurse Achterweg 10 NL SG Leidschendam / NL | Representative(s) | den Braber, Gérard Paul PROXIP Tour CIT, bureau 918 3, rue de l'Arrivée 75749 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [2024/33] |
Former [2021/30] | den Braber, Gérard Paul PROXIP Tour CIT Bureau 717 3, rue de l'Arrivée 75749 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19769795.6 | 17.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019EP74811 | Priority number, date | DE201810122730 | 17.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018122730 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058242 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853564 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3853564 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/02 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G01G19/024 (EP,US);
G01G3/125 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06F17/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER GEWICHTE VON FAHRZEUGEN IN BEWEGUNG | [2021/30] | English: | DETERMINING WEIGHTS OF VEHICLES IN MOTION | [2021/30] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DES POIDS DE VÉHICULES EN MOUVEMENT | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 19.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0223504 (KK HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-14,19,20 * abstract * * claim - ** figure - *; | [A]EP2372322 (KONINK BAM GROEP NV [NL]) [A] 1-14,19,20 * figure - * * claim - * * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] *; | [XAI]WO2017196168 (FUGRO TECH BV [NL]) [X] 5 * figure - * * claim - * * page 15, line 21 - page 24, line 6 * [A] 1-4,10 [I] 6-9,11-14,19,20 | by applicant | US2011127090 |