Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.11.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
02.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.09.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.06.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
25.06.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
31.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.03.2021 | Change - representative | |
05.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.03.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.03.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
22.11.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.09.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication |