Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112703245 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018122727 | 17.09.2018 | WO2019EP74408 | 12.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3853326 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018122727 | 17.09.2018 | WO2019EP74408 | 12.09.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020058093 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018122727 | 17.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018122727 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018122727 | 17.09.2018 |