EP3769873 - INSERT AND CUTTING TOOL PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Ayano c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION, 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
NOMIYAMA, Ryoma c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION, 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19770367.1 | 15.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019JP10877 | Priority number, date | JP20180052842 | 20.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018052842 | JP20180223530 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018223530 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019181792 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769873 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, C23C16/36, C23C16/40, C23C30/00, C23C28/04, C22C29/00, B22F3/24, B22F5/00, C22C29/04, C23C16/34, C23C16/02 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
C23C16/029 (EP);
C22C29/005 (EP);
C22C29/04 (EP);
C23C16/34 (EP);
C23C16/36 (EP);
C23C28/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | B23B27/14, C23C16/36, C23C16/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | EINSATZ UND DAMIT VERSEHENES SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2021/04] | English: | INSERT AND CUTTING TOOL PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2021/04] | French: | INSERT ET OUTIL DE COUPE LE COMPRENANT | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | Translation filed | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 12.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6007909 (ROLANDER ULF [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 1, 2; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US6413628 (NARASIMHAN KRISHNAN [US]) [A] 1-10* claims 1-20 *; | [A]EP1825943 (SUMITOMO ELEC HARDMETAL CORP [JP]) [A] 6-9 * paragraph [0065]; claims 1-7; table 1 *; | [XI]US2009223333 (TANIBUCHI TAKAHITO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040] * * claims 1,6,8 * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0014] * * table 1 * [I] 3,6-9; | [A]EP2308620 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 6-9 * figure 3 * | International search | [A]JPH07224346 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-10 * , [0 *; | [XYA]JP2004223666 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1 * , * [Y] 3-4, 10 [A] 2, 5-9; | [XYA]JP2006272515 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-2 * ,[0028] - [0029], [0 * [Y] 3, 10 [A] 4-9; | [A]JP2009166218 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-10* , [0 *; | [Y]JP2010105099 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 3-4, 10 * , [0 * | by applicant | JP5989930B |