EP3770462 - COMPOSITE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA Hideo c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO Kosaku c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 03 /
KIMOTO Yukitane c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19770500.7 | 01.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019JP08048 | Priority number, date | JP20180054342 | 22.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018054342 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019181434 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770462 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/12, B62D21/15, B62D29/00, B60R19/03, B60R19/18 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
F16F7/12 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (EP,US);
B60R19/18 (EP,US);
B62D29/001 (US);
B62D29/004 (EP,US);
B60R2019/1833 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | F16F7/12, B60R19/18, B62D21/00, B62D25/04, B62D25/20, F16F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTRUKTUR | [2021/04] | English: | COMPOSITE STRUCTURE | [2021/04] | French: | STRUCTURE COMPOSITE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2020 | Translation filed | 15.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11173358 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-6 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2004084820 (KATO RENTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0006], [0021]-[0025], [0032], [0035] *; | [X]US2009309387 (GORAL THOMAS M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2012153669 (NAGWANSHI DHANENDRA KUMAR [IN], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * paragraphs [0001], [0027] and [0032]-[0035] * [I] 2 | International search | [A]JP2001246995 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0040], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005170082 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-6 * , paragraph [0015], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012132552 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , fig. 2-4 & US 2013/0306419 A1, fig. 2-4 & WO 2012/073680 A1 & EP 2647868 A1 *; | [A]JP2016027969 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [A] 1-6* , paragraph [0028] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH11278301 | JP2007237944 | JP2010195352 | JP2017019428 |