EP3768784 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL COATINGS FOR USE IN WET ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphite Innovation and Technologies Inc. 1 Research Drive Dartmouth NS B2Y 4M9 / CA | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAIER, Marciel 208 Melrose Crescent Eastern Passage, NS B3G 1P2 / CA | 02 /
ALGERMOZI, Mohammed 311-94 Bedros Iane Halifax, NS B3M 4X3 / CA | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19770564.3 | 19.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019CA50334 | Priority number, date | US201862645504P | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645504 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019178682 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768784 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3768784 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/63, C09D163/00, C09D5/08, C09D5/16, C09D7/61, C09D7/80 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09D5/1687 (EP,KR,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/1472 (US);
C08G59/245 (US);
C08K3/042 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/08 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K3/346 (US);
C08K5/01 (KR);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08L91/00 (US);
C09D5/08 (EP);
C09D5/084 (EP,US);
C09D5/16 (EP);
C09D5/1693 (US);
C09D7/40 (EP);
C09D7/61 (EP,KR);
C09D7/63 (EP);
C09D7/70 (EP,KR);
C08K2003/0806 (US);
C08K2003/085 (US);
C08K2003/0881 (US);
C08K2003/2241 (US);
C08K2201/003 (US);
C08K2201/005 (US);
C08K2201/011 (US);
C08K2201/019 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08K3/042, C08L99/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONSBESCHICHTUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN NASSEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2021/04] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL COATINGS FOR USE IN WET ENVIRONMENTS | [2021/04] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS MULTIFONCTIONNELS POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS HUMIDES | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 19.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008268318 (JANG BOR Z [US], et al); | [X]WO2009106507 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [X]US2010000441 (JANG BOR Z [US], et al); | [X]US2017101571 (FUKUSHIMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2017100294 (ZHAMU ARUNA [US], et al) | by applicant | US2010330025 | DE102011003619 | CN103820055 | KR101459263B | CN104559669 | US2015152270 | CN104974640 | WO2015156851 | WO2015160764 | CN105385318 | CN105949946 | CN105969069 | US2017037257 | KR101717128B | CN106833248 | US2017260401 | CN107189573 | CN104946061B | CN107216768 |