EP3771194 - CAMERA MODULE AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Jian 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Junke 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Lijun 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 04 /
SHANG, Kongkong 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Bijun 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 06 /
YAO, Hongzhi 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19770813.4 | 14.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019CN78123 | Priority number, date | CN201810230491 | 20.03.2018 Original published format: CN201810230491 | [2021/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179353 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3771194 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04M1/02 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
H04N23/57 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/50 (CN);
G02B13/0015 (US);
H04M1/0264 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/0277 (CN,US);
H04N23/45 (EP);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/54 (CN);
H04N23/55 (EP,CN);
H04N23/685 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | KAMERAMODUL UND MOBILES TERMINAL | [2021/04] | English: | CAMERA MODULE AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2021/04] | French: | MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2020 | Translation filed | 13.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN205545560U (NANCHANG O-FILM TECH CO LTD) [Y] 3-7 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [XY]WO2017174022 (NINGBO SUNNY OPOTECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * abstract * * page 11, lines 20-28 * * figure 11 * [Y] 3-7; | [A]CN107483802 (TRULY OPTO ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** figure 3 * | International search | [Y]CN204928997U (GOERTEK INC) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 0019-0030, and figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CN205545560U (NANCHANG O-FILM TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 0040-0091, and figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN106131386 (BEIJING MI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN106454058 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN206807579U (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [PX]CN108174080 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *; | [PX]CN207518710U (GREE ELECTRIC APPLIANCES INC ZHUHAI) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 0031-0051, and figures 1-4 *; | [PX]CN207968659U (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 0024-0056, and figures 1-9 * |