Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.09.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
08.09.2023 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
11.05.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.05.2023 | First examination report | |
15.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.05.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
21.05.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
20.04.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.04.2021 | Change - classification | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.04.2021 | Change - classification | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
25.12.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
25.12.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
30.11.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.10.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.10.2020 | Change - representative | |
28.09.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.09.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |