Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11272088 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2022 | B2 | US2021075944 | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810230491 | 20.03.2018 | WO2019CN78123 | 14.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3771194 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | A4 | EP3771194 | 27.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810230491 | 20.03.2018 | WO2019CN78123 | 14.03.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019179353 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810230491 | 20.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108174080B | Global Dossier | 31.01.2020 | B | CN108174080 | 15.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201810230491 | 20.03.2018 |