EP3768386 - GENE THERAPEUTICS FOR TREATING BONE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIM, Jae-Hyuck 13 Corning Fairbanks Way Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 02 /
GAO, Guangping 4 Edward Dunn Way Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 03 /
XIE, Jun 48J Shrewsbury Green Drive Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 04 /
KIM, Jung, Min 509 Plantation Street Apt. 117 Worcester, MA 01605 / US | 05 /
WANG, Dan 6 Dogwood Drive Belchertown, MA 01007 / US | 06 /
YANG, Yeon-Suk 13 Corning Fairbanks Way Westborough, MA 01581 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19771342.3 | 22.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US23759 | Priority number, date | US201862647595P | 23.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862647595 P | US201962799843P | 01.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962799843 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183605 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768386 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P19/08, A61P19/10, C12N15/861, C12N15/63, C12N15/113 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
A61K48/005 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/00 (KR);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/005 (US);
C07K14/635 (US);
C12N15/111 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N15/1137 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/63 (EP);
A01K2217/075 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/035 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/141 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (EP,US);
C12N2320/32 (EP,US);
C12N2330/51 (EP);
C12N2750/14122 (US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | GENTHERAPEUTIKA ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KNOCHENERKRANKUNGEN | [2021/04] | English: | GENE THERAPEUTICS FOR TREATING BONE DISORDERS | [2021/04] | French: | THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES OSSEUX | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 07.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/12] | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP22199907.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9522611 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,11,12,15 * claim - * [Y] 1,2,5-12,15; | [XY]WO2016183297 (US HEALTH [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * example -; claim - * [Y] 1,2,5-12,15; | [XY] - YANG S-Y ET AL, "Adeno-associated virus-mediated osteoprotegerin gene transfer protects against particulate polyethylene-induced osteolysis in a murine model", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, US, (20020901), vol. 46, no. 9, doi:10.1002/art.10527, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 2514 - 2523, XP055864362 [X] 1,2,5-8,11,12,15 * abstract, materials and methods, results, discussion; * [Y] 1,2,5-12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10527 | [XY] - LUK K D K ET AL, "Adeno-associated virus-mediated bone morphogenetic protein-4 gene therapy for in vivo bone formation", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM NL, (20030829), vol. 308, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0006-291X(03)01429-3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 636 - 645, XP004444587 [X] 1,2,6-8,11,12,15 * abstract, materials and methods, results, discussion; * [Y] 1,2,5-12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(03)01429-3 | [XY] - ARAV A B ET AL, "Adeno-associated virus-coated allografts: a novel approach for cranioplasty : Adeno-associated virus-coated allografts for cranioplasty", JOURNAL OF TISSUE ENGINEERING AND REGENERATIVE MEDICINE, US, (20120903), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:10.1002/term.1594, ISSN 1932-6254, pages e43 - e50, XP055864351 [X] 1,2,6-8,11,12,15 * abstract, materials and methods, results, discussion; * [Y] 1,2,6-8,11,12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/term.1594 | [X] - KIM S P ET AL, "Sclerostin influences body composition by regulating catabolic and anabolic metabolism in adipocytes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, vol. 114, no. 52, doi:10.1073/pnas.1707876115, ISSN 0027-8424, (20171226), pages E11238 - E11247, URL: https://www.pnas.org/content/pnas/114/52/E11238.full.pdf, XP055864342 [X] 1,6-8,15 * abstract, results, discussion, materials and methods; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1707876115 | [Y] - LIU J ET AL, "Bi-directionally selective bone targeting delivery for anabolic and antiresorptive drugs: A novel combined therapy for osteoporosis?", MEDICAL HYPOTHESES, (2014), vol. 83, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.MEHY.2014.09.020, ISSN 0306-9877, pages 694 - 696, XP029097481 [Y] 7-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mehy.2014.09.020 | [Y] - TOMATSU S ET AL, "Current and emerging treatments and surgical interventions for Morquio A syndrome: a review", RESEARCH AND REPORTS IN ENDOCRINE DISORDERS, doi:10.2147/RRED.S37278, (20121211), page 65, URL: https://www.dovepress.com/getfile.php?fileID=14691, XP055864679 [Y] 7-9 * abstract; page 74, right-hand column, paragraph 2; figure 8; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/RRED.S37278 | [Y] - WU H ET AL, "siRNA delivery system mediated by (Aspartate-Serine-Serine)6 peptide for targeting bone formation site in osteoporotic skeleton", BONE, PERGAMON PRESS., OXFORD, GB, vol. 47, ISSN 8756-3282, (20101015), page S370, (20101015), XP027527637 [Y] 7-9 * the whole document * | [Y] - RYU T-K ET AL, "Bone-targeted delivery of nanodiamond-based drug carriers conjugated with alendronate for potential osteoporosis treatment", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160417), vol. 232, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2016.04.025, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 152 - 160, XP029565150 [Y] 7,8,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2016.04.025 | [Y] - HIDEMASA K ET AL, "Molecular Design of Bisphosphonate-Modified Proteins for Efficient Bone Targeting In Vivo", PLOS ONE, (20150101), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0135966, page e0135966, XP055421340 [Y] 7,8,10 * abstract, materials and methods, results, discussion; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0135966 | [T] - YANG Y-S ET AL, "Bone-targeting AAV-mediated silencing of Schnurri-3 prevents bone loss in osteoporosis", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41467-019-10809-6, (20191201), page 2958, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6609711/pdf/41467_2019_Article_10809.pdf, XP055863898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41467-019-10809-6 | International search | [Y]WO2014005314 (UNIV HONG KONG CHINESE [CN], et al) [Y] 23* ; page 4, paragraph 4 *; | [XY]US2014256917 (LAU KIN-HING WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0008], [0119], [0258] * [Y] 3, 5, 6/1-5, 7/6/1-5; | [Y]US2015176027 (GAO GUANGPING [US], et al) [Y] 23 * ; paragraphs [0041], [0054] *; | [Y] - KRAUSE, C et al., "Distinct Modes of Inhibition by Sclerostin on Bone Morphogenetic Protein and Wnt Signaling Pathway s", The Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20101015), vol. 285, no. 53, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.153890, pages 41614 - 41626, XP055007773 [Y] 3, 5, 6/1-5, 7/6/1-5 * ; page 41614, column 1, paragraph 1; page 41615, column 1, paragraphs 2-3; page 41615, column 2, paragraph 3; DOI: 10.1074/jbc.M110.153890 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.153890 | [Y] - XIE, J et al., "Short DNA Hairpins Compromise Recombinant Adeno-Associated Virus Genome Homogeneity", Molecular Therapy, (20170424), vol. 25, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.03.028, pages 1363 - 1374, XP055505649 [Y] 7/6/1-5 * ; abstract; page 1363, column 2, paragraph 3; DOI: 10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.03.028 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2017.03.028 |