EP3770440 - PROPELLER FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu General Limited 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8502 / JP | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWADA, Hirotaka c/o FUJITSU GENERAL LIMITED, 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8502 / JP | 02 /
FUNADA, Kazuya c/o FUJITSU GENERAL LIMITED, 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8502 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19771495.9 | 15.02.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019JP05708 | Priority number, date | JP20180054339 | 22.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018054339 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019181317 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770440 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/32, F04D29/38, F04D29/68 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
F04D29/329 (EP,US);
F04D29/32 (US);
F04D25/08 (US);
F04D29/322 (US);
F04D29/34 (US);
F04D29/384 (EP,US);
F04D29/388 (US);
F04D29/682 (EP);
F04D29/684 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | F04D29/32, F04D29/38 | ||
Former IPC [2021/04] | F04D29/32, F04D25/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | PROPELLERLÜFTER | [2021/04] | English: | PROPELLER FAN | [2021/04] | French: | VENTILATEUR À HÉLICE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2020 | Translation filed | 14.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005129518 (HAVEL BRIAN [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0019]; figures 1,2a,2b,2c *; | [A]US2009151911 (DE FILIPPIS PIETRO [IT], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0049] - [0051]; figures 4,5 *; | [XP]EP3406912 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [XP] 1 * paragraphs [0007] - [0033]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [X]CN104047893 (ZALMAN TECH CO LTD) [X] 1* , * | by applicant | JP2003503643 | JP2004116511 | JP2010101223 | WO2011011890 |