EP3768808 - LUBRICANT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASAN, David Eliezer 540 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 02 /
SCHOONMAKER, Jeffrey 540 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 03 /
FENTON, Ryan James 540 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 04 /
HOEY, Michael 540 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19771596.4 | 20.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US23113 | Priority number, date | US201862645272P | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862645272 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019183187 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768808 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/223, C10M169/04, C10M133/12, C10N30/02, C10N30/10, C10N30/12, C10N40/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
C10M133/12 (EP,KR,US);
C10M141/08 (US);
C10M125/22 (US);
C10M135/24 (US);
C10M137/10 (US);
C10M151/04 (US);
C10M169/04 (KR);
C10M101/02 (US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,KR);
C10M2207/026 (EP,KR);
C10M2207/288 (EP,KR);
C10M2215/064 (EP,KR);
C10M2215/065 (EP,KR);
C10M2215/223 (EP,KR);
C10M2219/022 (EP,KR);
C10M2219/024 (EP,KR);
C10M2223/043 (EP,KR);
C10N2010/04 (US);
C10N2010/12 (US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,KR);
C10N2030/10 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2040/02 (US);
C10N2040/135 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2060/10 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2203/1025, C10N2020/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | C10L1/223, C10M169/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/04] | English: | LUBRICANT COMPOSITION | [2021/04] | French: | COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 14.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4116874 (SUGIURA KENSUKE, et al) [X] 1-5,7,10,21-23,26-29 * and Comparative Examples 1, 5, 8 -10;; examples 1-3 *[A] 6,8,9,11-20,24,25,30; | [XI]EP0994175 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7,10,11,15,20-23,25-29 * page 8 - page 9; examples 7-16,19-31,33-38; table - * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * [I] 6,8,9,12-14,16-19,24,30; | [XA]US6207623 (BUTLER KEVIN DAVID [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,10,21-23,26-29 * example 1; table 1; compounds 1-3 * * example 2; table 2; compound - * [A] 8,9,11-20,24,25,30 | International search | [A]US6326336 (GATTO VINCENT JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 23-25, 27-29 * Entire Document *; | [A]US6426324 (LAI JOHN TA-YUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 23-25, 27-29* Entre Document *; | [X]US2010009875 (DONG JUN [US]) [X] 1-3, 23-25, 27-29 * para [0010]-[0014], [0019], Table 2; para [0023], [0034], [0037], [0041], [0050], Table 3; para [0118], [0127]-[0128], Table 7 *; | [A]US2011030269 (CHASAN DAVID ELIEZER [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 23-25, 27-29 * Entire Document *; | [A]US2014045736 (CRAWLEY SETH L [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 23-25, 27-29 * Entire Document * |