14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
06.01.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
18.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
28.01.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.01.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.01.2022 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
26.09.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.07.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.05.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
28.05.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
17.03.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.03.2021 |
First examination report |
|
20.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.11.2020 |
Change - inventor |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
14.07.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
01.05.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
01.05.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
30.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
16.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|