Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019179402 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178884 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178883 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178882 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178881 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178880 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178879 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178878 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019178877 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023220951 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | US202017021926 | 15.09.2020 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | WO2019CN78563 | 18.03.2019 | US202318182730 | 13.03.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11603959 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | B2 | US2020408355 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | WO2019CN78563 | 18.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4019823 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | EP19772213 | 18.03.2019 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | WO2019CN78563 | 18.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115264352 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | CN201980020333 | 18.03.2019 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | WO2019CN78563 | 18.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114294531B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2024 | B | CN114294531 | 08.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201880011493 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | CN202111592817 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114110364B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | B | CN114110364 | 01.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202111423803 | 23.03.2018 | CN201880012264 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113983309B | Global Dossier | 12.01.2024 | B | CN113983309 | 28.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202111229204 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | CN201880012002 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113566081 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110826778 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | CN201880011079 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113418106B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2023 | B | CN113418106 | 21.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | CN202110640840 | 23.03.2018 | CN201880011990 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113418104B | Global Dossier | 10.01.2023 | B | CN113418104 | 21.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | CN202110699287 | 23.03.2018 | CN201880011240 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113294671B | Global Dossier | 23.09.2022 | B | CN113294671 | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110556875 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | CN201880012033 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113294652B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2023 | B | CN113294652 | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201880012038 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | CN202110518123 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111886439B | Global Dossier | 12.08.2022 | B | CN111886439 | 03.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | WO2019CN78563 | 18.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110462277B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2021 | B | CN110462277 | 15.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110382942B | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B | CN110382942 | 25.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110337561B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2021 | B | CN110337561 | 15.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110325784B | Global Dossier | 11.06.2021 | B | CN110325784 | 11.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110312889B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2021 | B | CN110312889 | 08.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110312888B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2021 | B | CN110312888 | 08.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110312887B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2022 | B | CN110312887 | 08.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110291324B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2021 | B | CN110291324 | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3658814 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2022 | B1 | EP3658814 | 12.08.2020 | A4 | EP3658814 | 03.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN80373 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80370 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80371 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80372 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80366 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80367 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80368 | 23.03.2018 | WO2018CN80369 | 23.03.2018 | WO2019CN78563 | 18.03.2019 | Type | Divisional application | EP4019823 |