EP3768378 - A NOVEL METHOD TO SLOW VENTRICULAR RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InCarda Therapeutics, Inc. 39899 Balentine Drive Suite 185 Newark, California 94560 / US | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELARDINELLI, Luiz 205 Manzanita Avenue Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
NARASIMHAN, Rangachari 20661 Oak Creek Lane Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 03 /
SCHULER, Carlos 256 Lake Drive Kensington, California 94708 / US | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19772485.9 | 22.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019US23569 | Priority number, date | US201862646528P | 22.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862646528 P | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019183470 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3768378 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/138, A61K31/4458, A61K31/353, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61P9/06 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K9/0073 (US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/4458 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/0043 (US);
A61P9/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4458, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | A61N1/39 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR VERLANGSAMUNG DER VENTRIKULÄREN RATE | [2021/04] | English: | A NOVEL METHOD TO SLOW VENTRICULAR RATE | [2021/04] | French: | NOUVELLE MÉTHODE POUR RALENTIR LE RYTHME VENTRICULAIRE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011281853 (ARORA RISHI [US], et al) [X] 1, 5-17, 20-37 * ; Claim 2 para[0006] para[0010] para[0017] para[0031] para[0045] *; | [A]US2012003318 (SCHULER CARLOS A [US], et al) [A] 1, 5-17, 20-37* ; entire document *; | [A] - WORKMAN, "Cardiac adrenergic control and atrial fibrillation", Naunyn-Schmiedeberg's Archives of Pharmacology, (20091204), vol. 381, pages 1 - 23, XP019798475 [A] 8 * ; p10 * | [A] - CARRUTHERS et al., "Relationships between heart rate and PR interval during physiological and pharmacological interventions", British Journal of Clinical Pharmacology, (19870300), vol. 23, pages 259 - 265, XP055651911 [A] 9-11 * ; p259 * | [A] - WONG et al., "Blood pressure lowering efficacy of dual alpha and beta blockers for primary hypertension", Cochrane Systematic Review, (20150826), XP055651915 [A] 12-15 * , Abstract only; p1, p2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14651858.CD007449.pub2 | [A] - MAFFEI et al., "Characterization of Nitric Oxide Release by Nebivolol and Its Metabolites", American Journal of Hypertension, (20060601), vol. 19, doi:10.1016/j.amjhyper.2005.09.021, pages 579 - 586, XP024903880 [A] 36-37 * ; p584, p585 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjhyper.2005.09.021 | by applicant | US3991761 | US4069819 | US4114615 | US4247066 | US4338931 | US4846876 | US4995385 | WO9524183 | US5458135 | WO9531479 | WO9632096 | WO9632149 | US5619985 | US5785049 | US5855913 | US5874064 | WO9916420 | WO9916422 | WO9916421 | WO9916419 | US5922675 | US5985309 | WO0007572 | WO0072904 | US6257233 | WO0185136 | WO0185137 | US2002017295 | US6358530 | US6357490 | US6372258 | WO02083220 | US6503480 | US6546929 | US2004011358 | US2004035413 | WO2004071368 | WO2008051621 | US7473433 | US2011281853 | - MCNAMARA et al., Ann. Intern. Med., (20030000), vol. 139, pages 1018 - 1033 | - FERREIRA et al., Pharmacotherapy, (19970000), vol. 17, pages 1233 - 1237 | - REHNQVIST N., Ann. Clin. Res., (19810000), vol. 30, no. 13, pages 68 - 72 | - PLATIA EV et al., Am. J. Cardiol., (19890000), vol. 63, pages 925 - 929 | - WORKMAN, Naunyn-Schmiedeberg's Archives of Pharmacology, (20100000), vol. 381, page 1 | - CARRUTHERS et al., British Journal of Clinical Pharmacology, vol. 23, pages 259 - 265 |