EP3861531 - GENERATION OF PSEUDO RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGES FROM OPTICAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAHALA, Erkki Tapani High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/01] |
Former [2021/32] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 19772746.4 | 25.09.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019EP75793 | Priority number, date | EP20180198218 | 02.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18198218 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020069930 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861531 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3861531 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
G06T11/006 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T2207/10048 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/10088 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON PSEUDO-RÖNTGENBILDERN AUS OPTISCHEN BILDERN | [2021/32] | English: | GENERATION OF PSEUDO RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGES FROM OPTICAL IMAGES | [2021/32] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'IMAGES PSEUDO-RADIOGRAPHIQUES À PARTIR D'IMAGES OPTIQUES | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 03.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2011286649 (REISMAN JAMES G [US], et al) [I] 1,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2014212013 (HAN XIAO [US]) [I] 1,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]US2016073979 (BRAUN CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-14* the whole document *; | [I]US2017100078 (HAN XIAO [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0063] * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]WO2018048507 (HAN XIAO [US]) [I] 1,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0112] *; | [I] - SUZUKI KENJI ET AL, Neural Network Convolution (NNC) for Converting Ultra-Low-Dose to "Virtual" High-Dose CT Images, PROC. INT.CONF. ADV. BIOMETRICS (ICB); [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 334 - 343, (20170907), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047437118 [I] 1,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-67389-9_39 | by applicant | US2016073979 |